blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2021486

EP2021486 - Bio-organic compound production system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/07]APPARATUS FOR MAKING BIO-ORGANIC COMPOUNDS
[2014/26]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  24.12.2021
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2022Correction of patent specificationpublished on 20.04.2022  [2022/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amyris, Inc.
5885 Hollis Street, Suite 100
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
[2014/44]
Former [2011/28]For all designated states
Amyris, Inc.
5885 Hollis Street Suite 100
Emeryville CA 94608 / US
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Amyris Biotechnologies, Inc.
5980 Horton St., Suite 450
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RENNINGER, Neil, Stephen
4058 Lyman Road
Oakland, CA 94602 / US
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
Aurora Building
Counterslip
Bristol BS1 6BX / GB
[2022/04]
Former [2014/44]Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
33 Gutter Lane
London EC2V 8AS / GB
Former [2012/47]Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
33 Gutter Lane
London EC2V 8AS / GB
Former [2009/07]Ritter, Thomas Kurt
Jones Day Prinzregentenstraße 11
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date07777278.825.05.2007
[2014/44]
WO2007US12467
Priority number, dateUS20060808989P26.05.2006         Original published format: US 808989 P
US20060808666P26.05.2006         Original published format: US 808666 P
US20060870592P18.12.2006         Original published format: US 870592 P
US20070922782P10.04.2007         Original published format: US 922782 P
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2007139924
Date:06.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2021486
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2021486
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/44]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP2021486
Date:26.01.2022
Language:EN
[2022/04]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP2021486
Date:20.04.2022
[2022/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.03.2008
ClassificationIPC:C12P7/02, C12P7/04, C12P5/02, C12P5/00, C12M1/02, C10L1/02
[2014/26]
CPC:
C10L1/02 (EP,CN,US); C12M1/02 (KR); C12M21/12 (EP,CN,US);
C12P7/00 (KR,US); C12M1/04 (KR); C12M27/02 (EP,CN,US);
C12M27/20 (EP,CN,US); C12M41/18 (EP,CN,US); C12M41/22 (EP,CN,US);
C12N15/52 (EP,US); C12P5/007 (EP,CN,US); C12P5/026 (US);
C12P7/02 (EP,CN,US); C12P7/04 (EP,CN,US); Y02E50/30 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2009/07]C12P7/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2022/04]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesAL25.11.2008
BA25.11.2008
HR25.11.2008
MK25.11.2008
RS25.11.2008
TitleGerman:System zur Herstellung von bio-organischen Verbindungen[2014/44]
English:Bio-organic compound production system[2014/44]
French:Système de fabrication de composés bio-organiques[2014/44]
Former [2009/07]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG BIOORGANISCHER VERBINDUNGEN
Former [2009/07]APPARATUS FOR MAKING BIO-ORGANIC COMPOUNDS
Former [2009/07]DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION DE COMPOSÉS BIO-ORGANIQUES
Entry into regional phase25.11.2008National basic fee paid 
25.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
25.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
01.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
17.09.2014Fee for grant paid
17.09.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.07.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.07.2015  05.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
15-1 Kyobashi 1-Chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8315 / JP
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 [2015/37]
08.09.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.03.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
07.04.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
07.04.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.04.2021Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
21.09.2021Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
22.11.2021Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition19.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1587/17
16.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
02.02.2018Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M03) [2018/05]
10.05.2018Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2018/19]
30.04.2021Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
23.07.2021Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
30.04.2021Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.05.2007
AT29.10.2014
BE29.10.2014
BG29.10.2014
CY29.10.2014
CZ29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
MC29.10.2014
MT29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SI29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
TR29.10.2014
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
IE25.05.2015
LU25.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
[2017/46]
Former [2017/39]HU25.05.2007
AT29.10.2014
BG29.10.2014
CY29.10.2014
CZ29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
MC29.10.2014
MT29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SI29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
TR29.10.2014
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
IE25.05.2015
LU25.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
Former [2017/03]AT29.10.2014
CY29.10.2014
CZ29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
MC29.10.2014
MT29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SI29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
IE25.05.2015
LU25.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
Former [2016/20]AT29.10.2014
CY29.10.2014
CZ29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
MC29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SI29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
IE25.05.2015
LU25.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
Former [2016/12]AT29.10.2014
CY29.10.2014
CZ29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
MC29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SI29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
LU25.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
Former [2016/06]AT29.10.2014
CY29.10.2014
CZ29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
MC29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
LU25.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
Former [2015/37]AT29.10.2014
CY29.10.2014
CZ29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
SK29.10.2014
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
Former [2015/36]AT29.10.2014
CY29.10.2014
CZ29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
RO29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
Former [2015/35]AT29.10.2014
CY29.10.2014
EE29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
Former [2015/26]AT29.10.2014
CY29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
Former [2015/25]AT29.10.2014
FI29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
Former [2015/24]FI29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
LV29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
PL29.10.2014
SE29.10.2014
GR30.01.2015
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
Former [2015/23]FI29.10.2014
LT29.10.2014
NL29.10.2014
IS28.02.2015
PT02.03.2015
Former [2015/22]LT29.10.2014
PT02.03.2015
Former [2015/20]LT29.10.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]US4865973  (KOLLERUP FINN [CA], et al) [X] 1,46 * column 7, line 46 - column 11, line 26 *;
 [X]CH677791  (FIRMENICH & CIE) [X] 1,16 * page 4, line 8 - line 56 *;
 [X]US5763237  (SAVITHIRY NATARAJAN [US], et al) [X] 1,16 * column 5 - column 6 *;
 [X]US2002168733  (CLARK THOMAS R [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0023] , [0028] , [0059] *;
 [X]WO2005078110  (MAXENS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,16* claims 1-8 *;
 [X]  - ANTONIA ROJAS ET AL, "BIOTRANSFORMATION IN DOUBLE-PHASE SYSTEMS: PHYSIOLOGICAL RESPONSES OF PSEUDOMONAS PUTIDA DOT-T1E TO A DOUBLE PHASE MADE OF ALIPHATIC ALCOHOLS AND BIOSYNTHESIS OF SUBSTITUTED CATECHOLS", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (200406), vol. 70, no. 6, pages 3637 - 3643, XP002456441 [X] 1 * page 3637 - page 3638 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.70.6.3637-3643.2004
ExaminationJP2006109784
 DE3138493
 US2004229326
 DE102005018256
    - STARK D ET AL, "In situ product removal (ISPR) in whole cell biotechnology during the last twenty years", ADVANCES IN BIOCHEMICAL ENGINEERING, BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20030101), vol. 80, ISSN 0724-6145, pages 149 - 175, XP009043803
    - SCHUGERL K, "Integrated processing of biotechnology products", BIOTECHNOLOGY ADVANCES, ELSEVIER PUBLISHING, BARKING, GB, (20001101), vol. 18, no. 7, doi:10.1016/S0734-9750(00)00051-3, ISSN 0734-9750, pages 581 - 599, XP004317587

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0734-9750(00)00051-3
    - D. STARK ET AL, "Extractive Bioconversion of 2-Phenylethanol from L-Phenylalanine by Saccharomyces cerevisiae", BIOTECHNOLOGY PROGRESS, (20020607), vol. 18, no. 3, doi:10.1021/bp020006n, ISSN 8756-7938, pages 514 - 523, XP055049324

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bp020006n
    - BYUN S Y ET AL, "Two-phase airlift fermentor operation with elicitation for the enhanced production of benzophenanthridine alkaloids in cell suspensions of Escherichia californica", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, WILEY & SONS, HOBOKEN, NJ, US, (19940605), vol. 44, no. 1, doi:10.1002/BIT.260440104, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 14 - 20, XP002032586

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.260440104
    - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 33, Database accession no. 2006-311267, & JP2006109784 A 20060427 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEM CO INC)
    - NEWMAN J D ET AL, "Hihg-level production of amorpha-4,11-diene in a two phase partitioning bioreactor of metabolically engineered Escherichia coli", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, WILEY & SONS, HOBOKEN, NJ, US, (20060728), vol. 95, doi:10.1002/BIT.21017, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 684 - 691, XP002592776

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/BIT.21017
by applicant   - NEWMAN, BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (20060728), vol. 95, pages 684 - 691
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.