Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023760

EP2023760 - IMPACT-ATTENUATION MEMBERS WITH LATERAL AND SHEAR FORCE STABILITY AND PRODUCTS CONTAINING SUCH MEMBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.09.2013
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IS
published on 03.08.2016  [2016/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nike International Ltd.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
[2012/46]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Nike International Ltd.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005 / US
Inventor(s)01 / AVENI, Michael, A.
Nike, Inc.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
02 / SMALDONE, Patricia, L.
Nike, Inc.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
03 / FAGERGREN, Fred, G.
Nike, Inc.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
 [2012/46]
Former [2009/08]01 / AVENI, Michael, A.
Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
02 / SMALDONE, Patricia, L.
Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
03 / FAGERGREN, Fred, G.
Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
Representative(s)Tombling, Adrian George , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[2012/46]
Former [2009/08]Tombling, Adrian George , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London
SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date07777310.930.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007US12667
Priority number, dateUS2006042213705.06.2006         Original published format: US 422137
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007145810
Date:21.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2023760
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2023760
Date:14.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:A43B13/18
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:SCHLAGDÄMPFUNGSELEMENTE MIT SEITEN- UND SCHERKRAFTSTABILITÄT SOWIE PRODUKTE MIT DERARTIGEN ELEMENTEN[2009/08]
English:IMPACT-ATTENUATION MEMBERS WITH LATERAL AND SHEAR FORCE STABILITY AND PRODUCTS CONTAINING SUCH MEMBERS[2009/08]
French:ÉLÉMENTS D'ATTÉNUATION D'IMPACT PRÉSENTANT UNE STABILITÉ DES FORCES LATÉRALES ET DE CISAILLEMENT ET PRODUITS CONTENANT DES ÉLÉMENTS DE CE TYPE[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase16.12.2008National basic fee paid 
16.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
16.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
23.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2012Fee for grant paid
27.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.11.2011
Opposition(s)15.08.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.05.2007
AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
IS14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
MC14.11.2012
MT14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
TR14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
IE30.05.2013
LU30.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
[2016/31]
Former [2015/34]HU30.05.2007
AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
MC14.11.2012
MT14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
TR14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
IE30.05.2013
LU30.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2015/32]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
MC14.11.2012
MT14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
TR14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
IE30.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2015/13]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
MC14.11.2012
MT14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
IE30.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/20]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
MC14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
IE30.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/08]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
MC14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/03]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
MC14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/52]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/37]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/35]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/34]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/31]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/28]BE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/27]BE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
Former [2013/26]FI14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
Former [2013/24]FI14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
Former [2013/23]FI14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
ES25.02.2013
Former [2013/22]FI14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
ES25.02.2013
Former [2013/21]LT14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
Former [2013/20]LT14.11.2012
Cited inInternational search[X]US4187620  (SELNER ALLEN J [US]) [X] 1-98 * column 2; figure 4 *;
 [X]WO2005025381  (1493707 ONTARIO LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1-98 * figure 4; claim - *;
 [X]US2004221483  (CARTIER MARK [US], et al) [X] 1-98 * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]US4936030  (RENNEX BRIAN G [US]) [X] 1-98 * figure -; claim - *
Examination US4638577