Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026924

EP2026924 - PROCESS FOR MAKING HIGHLY DISPERSIBLE SPHERICAL SILVER POWDER PARTICLES AND SILVER PARTICLES FORMED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.11.2013
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 11.06.2014  [2014/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
Former [2008/30]For all designated states
E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / IRIZARRY-RIVERA, Roberto
5801 Valley Mist Court
Raleigh, NC, 27613 / US
02 / GLICKSMAN, Howard David
4106 Colville Road
Durham, NC 27707 / US
03 / ALVARADO, Victor M. Rivera
Highway 685, KM 5.0, BO Boquillas
Manati, 00674 / PR
 [2009/16]
Former [2009/09]01 / IRIZARRY-RIVERA, Roberto
Alturas de Manati 17
Manati, 00674 / PR
02 / GLICKSMAN, Howard David
4106 Colville Road
Durham, NC 27707 / US
03 / ALVARADO, Victor M. Rivera
Highway 685, KM 5.0, BO Boquillas
Manati, 00674 / PR
Representative(s)Hoffmann, Benjamin , et al
Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/40]Hoffmann, Benjamin , et al
Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2009/09]Towler, Philip Dean
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date07777363.801.06.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007US12993
Priority number, dateUS20060810359P02.06.2006         Original published format: US 810359 P
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007143125
Date:13.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2026924
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2026924
Date:09.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:B22F1/00, B22F9/24
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/26]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG HOCH DISPERGIERBARER KUGELFÖRMIGER SILBERPULVERPARTIKEL UND DARAUS GEFORMTE SILBERPARTIKEL[2009/09]
English:PROCESS FOR MAKING HIGHLY DISPERSIBLE SPHERICAL SILVER POWDER PARTICLES AND SILVER PARTICLES FORMED THEREFROM[2009/09]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PARTICULES DE POUDRE D'ARGENT SPHÉRIQUES HAUTEMENT DISPERSIBLES ET PARTICULES D'ARGENT FORMÉES À PARTIR DE CELLES-CI[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase26.11.2008National basic fee paid 
26.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
03.01.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
09.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
01.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2012Fee for grant paid
26.11.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.07.2009
Opposition(s)10.10.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB01.06.2013
FR01.07.2013
[2014/24]
Former [2014/21]GB01.06.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]JPS63307206  (TANAKA PRECIOUS METAL IND) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [AX]WO2005075133  (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * [X] 12,13;
 [APX]EP1721690  (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP]) [AP] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] - [0015] * [X] 12,13
 [X]  - MACEK ET AL, "Preparation of sub- and micrometer silver powders", MATERIALI IN TEHNOLOGIJE - MATERIALS AND TECHNOLOGY, INSTITUT ZA KOVINSKE MATEIRALE IN TEHNOLOGIJE, LJUBLJANA, SI, (2005), vol. 39, no. 4, ISSN 1580-2949, pages 113 - 118, XP009091478 [X] 1-7,9-11 * abstract * * table 2 *
 [X]  - NAGAOKA ET AL, "Investigation and application of silver powder reduced with L-ascorbic acid (or LAX Ag)", INTERNATIONAL PRECIOUS METALS CONFERENCE, XX, XX, (20030614), pages 9 - 21, XP009091480 [X] 1 * points 2-1, 3-3 *
 [A]  - SONDI IVAN ET AL, "Preparation of highly concentrated stable dispersions of uniform silver nanoparticles", J. COLLOID INTERFACE SCI.; JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE APR 1 2003, (20030401), vol. 260, no. 1, pages 75 - 81, XP002456883 [A] 1 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9797(02)00205-9
 [A]  - WIDONIAK ET AL, "Silver particles tailoring of shapes and sizes", COLLOIDS AND SURFACES. A, PHYSICACHEMICAL AND ENGINEERING ASPECTS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20051201), vol. 270-271, ISSN 0927-7757, pages 340 - 344, XP005161121 [A] 1 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.colsurfa.2005.09.004
 [A]  - SUBER L ET AL, "Preparation and the mechanisms of formation of silver particles of different morphologies in homogeneous solutions", JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, ACADEMIC PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20050815), vol. 288, no. 2, ISSN 0021-9797, pages 489 - 495, XP004909450 [A] 1 * point 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcis.2005.03.017
by applicantJPS63307206
 WO2005075133
 HU194758
 DD259000
    - MACEK ET AL., MATERIALS AND TECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 39, pages 113 - 118,
    - NAGAOKA ET AL., INTERNATIONAL PRECIOUS METALS CONFERENCE, (20030614), vol. XX, XX, pages 9 - 21,
    - SANDI, JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 260, pages 75 - 81,
    - WIDSNIAK ET AL., COLLOIDS AND SURFACES A: PHYSICOCHEM. ENG. ASPECTS, (2005), vol. 270, no. 271, pages 340 - 344,
    - SUBER ET AL., JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 288, pages 489 - 495,