blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2001537

EP2001537 - VARIABLE DOSE INHALATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.12.2011
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MicroDose Therapeutx, Inc.
4262 U.S. Route 1, Suite 3
Monmouth Junction, NJ 08852 / US
[2011/06]
Former [2009/36]For all designated states
MicroDose Therapeutx, Inc.
4262 U.S. Route 1 Suite 3
Monmouth Junction NJ 08852 / US
Former [2008/51]For all designated states
Microdose Technologies Inc.
Suite 3, 4262 U.S. Route 1
Monmouth Junction, NJ 08852 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FLEMING, Scott
18 Riverview Drive
Ewing, New Jersey 08628 / US
02 / GUMASTE, Anand, V.
7 Ardsley Court
West Windsor, New Jersey 08550 / US
03 / KRIKSUNOV, Leo, B.
5 Perry Lane
Ithaca, New York 14850 / US
04 / AKERMAN, Adan
c/o Microdose Therapeutx, inc. 4262 US Route 1, Suite 3
Monmouth Junction, New Jersey 08852 / US
 [2011/06]
Former [2008/51]01 / FLEMING, Scott
18 Riverview Drive
Ewing, New Jersey 08628 / US
02 / GUMASTE, Anand, V.
7 Ardsley Court
West Windsor, New Jersey 08550 / US
03 / KRIKSUNOV, Leo, B.
5 Perry Lane
Ithaca, New York 14850 / US
04 / AKERMAN, Adan
c/o Microdose Technologies, Inc. 4262 US Route 1, Suite 3
Monmouth Junction, New Jersey 08852 / US
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/51]Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstraße 55
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date07781365.704.04.2007
[2008/51]
WO2007US66005
Priority number, dateUS20060789290P05.04.2006         Original published format: US 789290 P
US2007069668304.04.2007         Original published format: US 696683
[2008/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2007121097
Date:25.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/43]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2001537
Date:17.12.2008
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2008/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2001537
Date:09.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.11.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.2009
ClassificationIPC:A61M11/00, // A61M15/00
[2011/06]
CPC:
A61M15/0045 (EP,US); A61M15/00 (KR); A61M11/00 (KR);
A61M15/0003 (EP,US); A61M15/001 (EP,US); A61M15/0028 (EP,US);
A61M15/0035 (EP,US); A61M15/005 (EP,US); A61M15/0051 (EP,US);
A61M15/0066 (EP,US); A61M15/008 (EP,US); B05B12/081 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0039 (EP,US); A61M2202/064 (EP,US); A61M2205/3306 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3375 (EP,US); A61M2205/43 (EP,US); A61M2205/502 (EP,US);
A61M2205/581 (EP,US); A61M2205/583 (EP,US); B05B7/1404 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2009/08]A61M11/00
Former IPC [2008/51]A61M15/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/51]
Extension statesAL02.10.2008
BA02.10.2008
HR02.10.2008
MK02.10.2008
RS02.10.2008
TitleGerman:INHALATIONSVORRICHTUNG FÜR VARIABLE DOSIERUNG[2008/51]
English:VARIABLE DOSE INHALATION DEVICE[2008/51]
French:DISPOSITIF D'INHALATION À DOSES VARIABLES[2008/51]
Entry into regional phase02.10.2008National basic fee paid 
02.10.2008Search fee paid 
02.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
02.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.10.2008Examination requested  [2008/51]
21.05.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.08.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2010Fee for grant paid
17.12.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10195741.3  / EP2357015
Opposition(s)10.11.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2012/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
HU09.02.2011
IS09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
MT09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
MC30.04.2011
BG09.05.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/33]CZ09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
IS09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
MT09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
MC30.04.2011
BG09.05.2011
Former [2012/05]CZ09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
MT09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
MC30.04.2011
BG09.05.2011
Former [2011/51]CZ09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
MC30.04.2011
BG09.05.2011
Former [2011/49]CZ09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
Former [2011/38]FI09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
Former [2011/36]LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9964095  (MICRODOSE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 1, lines 3-8 * * page 7, line 25 - page 9, line 8 * * page 16, line 1 - page 25, line 12 *;
 [X]EP1166812  (MICRODOSE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0006] - [0010] ** paragraphs [0012] - [0027] *;
 [X]WO0204055  (AEROGEN INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 10 - page 2, line 22 * * page 3, line 7 - page 7, line 4 *;
 [X]US2002129812  (LITHERLAND CRAIG [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0003] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0023] - [0042] *
International search[Y]US2002138588  (LEEDS RICHARD [US]);
 [Y]US2004111467  (WILLIS BRIAN [US])
by applicantUS5694920
 WO9964095
 US6142146
 EP1166812
 WO0204055
 US2002129812
 US6684879
 US2005183724
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.