Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2008146

EP2008146 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ANGULAR SLICE TRUE 3-D DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.04.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG, CY, HU, PT, TR
published on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Third Dimension IP LLC
3601 Bluff Point Drive
Knoxville TN 37920 / US
[2014/21]
Former [2009/01]For all designated states
Third Dimension IP LLC
3601 Bluff Point Drive
Knoxville TN 37920 / US
Inventor(s)01 / THOMAS, Clarence E., Jr.
3601 Bluff Point Drive
Knoxville, TN 37920 / US
 [2009/01]
Representative(s)Bryn-Jacobsen, Caelia , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/21]Bryn-Jacobsen, Caelia , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2012/33]Bryn-Jacobsen, Caelia , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2009/01]Miller, James Lionel Woolverton , et al
Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date07782047.017.04.2007
[2009/01]
WO2007US66790
Priority number, dateUS20060744977P17.04.2006         Original published format: US 744977 P
[2009/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007121440
Date:25.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/43]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2008146
Date:31.12.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007
[2009/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2008146
Date:21.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.10.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.09.2009
ClassificationInternational:G02B27/22, G03H1/30, H04N13/04, G03B35/24, G03H1/26, G03B35/20, G03H1/22
[2012/48]
Former International [2009/43]G03B21/14, G03B27/22, G03B35/20, H04N13/00
Former International [2009/11]G03B21/14
Former International [2009/01]G02B27/22, G03B21/26
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/01]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR WINKELSCHNITTGETREUEN 3D-ANZEIGE[2009/01]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ANGULAR SLICE TRUE 3-D DISPLAY[2009/01]
French:SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES POUR AFFICHAGE 3D TOTAL A TRANCHE ANGULAIRE[2009/01]
Entry into regional phase09.10.2008National basic fee paid 
09.10.2008Search fee paid 
09.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
09.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/01]
09.12.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2011Observations by third parties
18.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2013Observations by third parties
11.04.2013Fee for grant paid
11.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.08.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Holografika Kft
1192 Budapest
Ady Endre út 3a / HU
Opponent's representative
Mak, Andras
S.B.G. & K. Patent and Law Offices
Andrassy ut 113.
1062 Budapest / HU
 [2015/14]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
02.04.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.10.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.11.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.11.2016
28.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
02.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
13.04.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.04.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition13.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1408/17
18.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
07.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.04.2007
AT21.05.2014
BE21.05.2014
BG21.05.2014
CY21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
IT21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
MT21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
TR21.05.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
PT21.09.2014
IE17.04.2015
LU17.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2017/03]AT21.05.2014
BE21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
IT21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
MT21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
IE17.04.2015
LU17.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/20]AT21.05.2014
BE21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
IT21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
IE17.04.2015
LU17.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/06]AT21.05.2014
BE21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
IT21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
LU17.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/01]AT21.05.2014
BE21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
IT21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
MC21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
LU17.04.2015
Former [2015/52]AT21.05.2014
BE21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
IT21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
LU17.04.2015
Former [2015/36]AT21.05.2014
BE21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
IT21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SI21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
Former [2015/22]AT21.05.2014
BE21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
IT21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
Former [2015/12]AT21.05.2014
BE21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
NL21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
Former [2015/11]AT21.05.2014
BE21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
RO21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
Former [2015/10]AT21.05.2014
BE21.05.2014
CZ21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
EE21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
SK21.05.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
Former [2015/08]AT21.05.2014
BE21.05.2014
DK21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
Former [2014/51]AT21.05.2014
ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
Former [2014/50]ES21.05.2014
FI21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
LV21.05.2014
PL21.05.2014
SE21.05.2014
GR22.08.2014
IS21.09.2014
Former [2014/49]FI21.05.2014
LT21.05.2014
IS21.09.2014
Former [2014/48]LT21.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]US6533420  (EICHENLAUB JESSE B [US]) [X] 1-15 * column 2, line 42 - column 15, line 4; figures 1-14 *;
 [X]WO2005117458  (BALOGH TIBOR [HU]) [X] 1-15 * page 14, line 17 - page 38, line 16; figures 1-52 *;
 [X]JP2004032273  (SONY CORP) [X] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [X]US5993003  (MCLAUGHLIN JOSEPH L [US]) [X] 1-15 * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 67 *;
 [X]WO9939513  (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]; HALL ESTILL THONE JR [US]; PFILE WE) [X] 1-15 * page 17, line 22 - page 26, line 17 *
International search[XY]US2006256302  (HSU FENG-HSIUNG [US]) [X] 1-3, 6-8 * SEE ENTIRE DOCUMENT * [Y] 9-11, 13-21;
 [A]US6665100  (KLUG MICHAEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * SEE ENTIRE DOCUMENT *;
 [A]US5855425  (HAMAGISHI GORO [JP]) [A] 1-21 * SEE ENTIRE DOCUMENT *;
 [A]US5379133  (KIRK RONALD L [US]) [A] 1-21 * SEE ENTIRE DOCUMENT *;
 [A]US3814513  (NIMS J, et al) [A] 1-21 * SEE ENTIRE DOCUMENT *
by applicantUS5993003
 WO9939513
 JP2004032273
otherWO2005117458
 WO0188598
 WO0217646
 US6837585
    - BALOGH T., "The Holo Vizio System", SPIE PROCEEDINGS (STEREOSCOPIC DISPLAYS AND VIRTUAL REALITY SYSTEMS XIII), SAN JOSE CA, (20060116), vol. 6055, XP003028509
    - BALOGH T. ET AL, "A scalable hardware and software system for the holographic display of interactive graphics applications", EUROGRAPHICS, (2005), pages 1 - 4, XP003030723