Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021487

EP2021487 - THERMOPHILIC ORGANISMS FOR CONVERSION OF LIGNOCELLULOSIC BIOMASS TO ETHANOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.04.2014
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.04.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.05.2014  [2014/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Trustees of Dartmouth College
11 Rope Ferry Road
Hanover, NH 03755 / US
For all designated states
Mascoma Corporation
161 First Street, Second Floor East
Cambridge MA 02142 / US
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / SHAW, Arthur Josephus
51 Drake Lane
West Lebanon, NH 03766 / US
02 / DESAI, Sunil G.
4056 Arjay Circle
Ellicott City, MD 21042 / US
03 / LYND, Lee R.
181 Bean Road
Meriden, NH 03770 / US
04 / TYURIN, Mikhail V.
1305 Pineland Road
Bain Bridge, Georgia 39819 / US
05 / PODKAMINER, Kara
11 Rope Ferry Road
Hanover, NH 03755 / US
06 / BARDSLEY, John
40 Schoolhouse Road
Newport, NH 03773-1969 / US
07 / HOGSETT, David Anthony
6 Winter Hill
Grantham, NH / US
 [2009/17]
Former [2009/07]01 / SHAW, Arthur Josephus
51 Drake Lane
West Lebanon, NH 03766 / US
02 / DESAI, Sunil G.
4056 Arjay Circle
Ellicott City, MD 21042 / US
03 / LYND, Lee R.
181 Bean Road
Meriden, NH 03770 / US
04 / TYURIN, Mikhail V.
20 Wolf Road, Unit A-11
Lebanon, NH 03766 / US
05 / PODKAMINER, Kara
11 Rope Ferry Road
Hanover, NH 03755 / US
06 / BARDSLEY, John
161 First Street, Second Floor East
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
07 / HOGSETT, David Anthony
6 Winter Hill
Grantham, NH / US
Representative(s)m patent group
Postfach 33 04 29
80064 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/38]Kudlek & Grunert Patentanwälte
Postfach 33 04 29
80064 München / DE
Former [2009/07]Hössle Kudlek & Partner
Sendlinger Strasse 29
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date07783037.001.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007US67941
Priority number, dateUS20060796380P01.05.2006         Original published format: US 796380 P
WO2006US4244231.10.2006         Original published format: PCT/US2006/042442
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007130984
Date:15.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2021487
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.07.2008
ClassificationInternational:C12P7/06
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:THERMOPHILE ORGANISMEN ZUR UMWANDLUNG VON LIGNOZELLULOSE-BIOMASSE IN ETHANOL[2009/07]
English:THERMOPHILIC ORGANISMS FOR CONVERSION OF LIGNOCELLULOSIC BIOMASS TO ETHANOL[2009/07]
French:ORGANISMES THERMOPHILES POUR LA CONVERSION DE BIOMASSE LIGNO-CELLULOSIQUE EN ETHANOL[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase28.11.2008National basic fee paid 
28.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
28.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
16.01.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/20]
09.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/20]
Divisional application(s)EP11177420.4  / EP2397556
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.08.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201307   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2005118828  (VALTION TEKNILLINEN [FI], et al) [Y] 28-39 * abstract *;
 [DXY]  - DESAI S G ET AL, "Cloning of L-lactate dehydrogenase and elimination of lactic acid production via gene knockout in Thermoanaerobacterium saccharolyticum JW/SL-YS485", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (20040306), vol. 65, no. 5, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 600 - 605, XP002393736 [DX] 1-5,11-15 * the whole document * [Y] 6-10,16,28-39

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-004-1575-9
 [Y]  - LYND L R ET AL, "MICROBIAL CELLULOSE UTILIZATION: FUNDAMENTALS AND BIOTECHNOLOGY", MICROBIOLOGY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY REVIEWS, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (200209), vol. 66, no. 3, ISSN 1092-2172, pages 506 - 577, XP001120774 [Y] 6-10,16 * page 547 - page 548 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MMBR.66.3.506-577.2002
 [Y]  - SUN Y ET AL, "Hydrolysis of lingnocellulosic materials for ethanol production: a review", BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, GB, (2002), vol. 83, ISSN 0960-8524, pages 1 - 11, XP002988039 [Y] 28-39 * page 7 - page 8 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-8524(01)00212-7
 [Y]  - LIN YAN ET AL, "Ethanol fermentation from biomass resources: current state and prospects", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (20051206), vol. 69, no. 6, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 627 - 642, XP002407201 [Y] 28-39 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-005-0229-x
 [A]  - PAYTON M A, "PRODUCTION OF ETHANOL BY THERMOPHILIC BACTERIA", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1984), vol. 2, no. 6, ISSN 0167-7799, pages 153 - 158, XP000999007 [A] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-7799(84)90032-5
 [A]  - BISWAS I ET AL, "HIGH-EFFICIENCY GENE INACTIVATION AND REPLACEMENT SYSTEM FOR GRAM-POSITIVE BACTERIA", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19930601), vol. 175, no. 11, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 3628 - 3635, XP000563688 [A] * the whole document *
 [PX]  - HAHN-HAGERDAL ET AL, "Bio-ethanol - the fuel of tomorrow from the residues of today", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (20061118), vol. 24, no. 12, ISSN 0167-7799, pages 549 - 556, XP005729394 [PX] 28-39 * page 551 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2006.10.004