Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021376

EP2021376 - EXTRUDED FILAMENT HAVING HIGH DEFINITION CROSS-SECTIONAL INDICIA/CODING, MICROSCOPIC TAGGING SYSTEM FORMED THEREFROM, AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF FOR ANTI-COUNTERFEITING AND PRODUCT AUTHENTICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.04.2014
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.04.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.05.2014  [2014/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HILLS, INC.
7785 Ellis Road
W.Melbourne, FL 32904 / US
For all designated states
Armark Authentication Technologies, Inc.
400 Seaks Run Road
Glen Rock, PA 17327 / US
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / GABRIELE, Peter G.
2129 Narnia
York, Pennsylvania 17404 / US
02 / ROBERTSON, Jeffrey H.
977 Willowridge Road
York, Pennsylvania 17404 / US
03 / FLEMMENS, Michael S.
58 Manchester Street
Glen Rock, Pennsylvania 17327 / US
04 / WEIR, Matthew G.
3840 Bear Road
York, Pennsylvania 17406 / US
05 / HAGGARD, Jeffrey S.
560 Amber Lane
Cocoa, Florida 32926 / US
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
[2014/16]
Former [2011/17]Stones, James Alexander , et al
Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
Former [2009/07]Burford, Anthony Frederick
Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
Application number, filing date07783613.810.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007US68706
Priority number, dateUS20060799032P10.05.2006         Original published format: US 799032 P
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007134192
Date:22.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2021376
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.01.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2011
ClassificationInternational:C08B37/08, D01D5/36, D01F8/00, D01D5/253, D01F1/06, C09D11/00, G09F3/00, B42D15/00, D01D5/00
[2011/45]
Former International [2009/07]C08B37/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EXTRUDIERTE FASER MIT HOCHAUFLÖSENDER QUERSCHNITTSMARKIERUNG/-KODIERUNG, DARAUS HERGESTELLTES MIKROSKOPISCHES ETIKETTIERUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER VERWENDUNG FÜR FÄLSCHUNGSSCHUTZ UND PRODUKTAUTHENTIFIZIERUNG[2009/07]
English:EXTRUDED FILAMENT HAVING HIGH DEFINITION CROSS-SECTIONAL INDICIA/CODING, MICROSCOPIC TAGGING SYSTEM FORMED THEREFROM, AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF FOR ANTI-COUNTERFEITING AND PRODUCT AUTHENTICATION[2009/07]
French:FILAMENT EXTRUDÉ POSSÉDANT UN CODAGE/INDICE EN COUPE DE HAUTE DÉFINITION, SYSTÈME D'ÉTIQUETAGE MICROSCOPIQUE FORMÉ DE CE FILAMENT ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION DE CELUI-CI POUR AUTHENTIFIER ET LUTTER CONTRE LA CONTREFAÇON[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase08.12.2008National basic fee paid 
08.12.2008Search fee paid 
08.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
08.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
24.04.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.12.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/21]
09.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201307   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]US4640035  (KIND STUART S [GB], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 1, lines 4-8; figures 1,7; claims 1-15 * * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 15 * * column 2, lines 46-56 * * column 6, lines 3-14 *;
 [I]US5162074  (HILLS WILLIAM H [US]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2002160188  (TAM THOMAS Y-T [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2005189255  (SAFIAN JOHN W [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4768857  (SAKUNAGA KENICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]GB176921  (SYDNEY MALCOLM WHITE) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [AP]WO2006050345  (ADHESIVES RES INC [US], et al) [AP] 1-15 * abstract *
International search[Y]US6951687  (NIGHTINGALE STEPHEN D [US], et al);
 [Y]US6887701  (ANDERSON NORMAN G [US], et al);
 [Y]US6780799  (SHALABY SHALABY W [US])