Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026816

EP2026816 - TREPROSTINIL ADMINISTRATION USING A METERED DOSE INHALER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.05.2018
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip16.05.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United Therapeutics Corporation
1110 Spring Street
Silver Spring, MD 20910 / US
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / OLSCHEWSKI, Horst
United Therapeutics Corporation 1110 Spring Street
Silver Spring, MD 20910 / US
02 / ROSCIGNO, Robert
United Therapeutics Corporation 1110 Spring Street
Silver Spring, MD 20910 / US
03 / RUBIN, Lewis, J.
United Therapeutics Corporation 1110 Spring Street
Silver Spring, MD 20910 / US
04 / SCHMEHL, Thomas
United Therapeutics Corporation 1110 Spring Street
Silver Spring, MD 20910 / US
05 / SEEGER, Werner
United Therapeutics Corporation 1110 Spring Street
Silver Spring, MD 20910 / US
06 / STERRITT, Carl
United Therapeutics Corporation 1110 Spring Street
Silver Spring, MD 20910 / US
07 / VOSWINCKEL, Robert
United Therapeutics Corporation 1110 Spring Street
Silver Spring, MD 20910 / US
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
[2012/49]
Former [2009/49]Ahner, Francis , et al
Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR
Former [2009/09]Ahner, Francis , et al
Cabinet Régimbeau, 20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Application number, filing date07783735.914.05.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007US68884
Priority number, dateUS20060800016P15.05.2006         Original published format: US 800016 P
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007134292
Date:22.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2026816
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61P9/12, A61K31/557, A61K9/00, A61K31/192
[2018/22]
Former International [2009/09]A61K31/557, A61K9/72, A61K9/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERABREICHUNG VON TREPROSTINIL MITTELS INHALATOR MIT ABGEMESSENER DOSIS[2009/09]
English:TREPROSTINIL ADMINISTRATION USING A METERED DOSE INHALER[2009/09]
French:ADMINISTRATION DE TREPROSTINIL UTILISANT UN INHALATEUR À DOSE MESURÉE[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase03.12.2008National basic fee paid 
03.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
24.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.02.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[X]US6521212  (CLOUTIER GILLES [US], et al) [X] 1-51 * example - * * claim - *;
 [PXD]  - VOSWINCKEL ET AL, "Favorable Effects of Inhaled Treprostinil in Severe Pulmonary Hypertension", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF CARDIOLOGY, ELSEVIER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20061017), vol. 48, no. 8, ISSN 0735-1097, pages 1672 - 1681, XP005721086 [PXD] 1-51 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jacc.2006.06.062
 [PX]  - GHOFRANI ET AL, "Hypoxia- and non-hypoxia-related pulmonary hypertension - Established and new therapies", CARDIOVASCULAR RESEARCH, XX, XX, (20061001), vol. 72, no. 1, ISSN 0008-6363, pages 30 - 40, XP005635195 [PX] 1-51 * page 35, column 1, paragraph 2.3.5. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cardiores.2006.07.025
 [X]  - VOSWINCKEL ROBERT ET AL, "Inhaled treprostinil [corrected] for treatment of chronic pulmonary arterial hypertension.", ANNALS OF INTERNAL MEDICINE 17 JAN 2006, (20060117), vol. 144, no. 2, ISSN 1539-3704, pages 149 - 150, XP002454451 [X] 1-51 * the whole document *
 [X]  - SANDIFER BRETT L ET AL, "Potent effects of aerosol compared with intravenous treprostinil on the pulmonary circulation", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSIOLOGY, (200512), vol. 99, no. 6, ISSN 8750-7587, pages 2363 - 2368, XP002454664 [X] 1-51 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/japplphysiol.00083.2005