Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026707

EP2026707 - DILATATION CATHETER ASSEMBLY WITH BIPOLAR CUTTING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  26.03.2010
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2010Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 28.04.2010  [2010/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
APPLIED MEDICAL RESOURCES CORPORATION
22872 Avenida Empresa
Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
APPLIED MEDICAL RESOURCES CORPORATION
22872 Avenida Empresa
Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FALKENSTEIN, Zoran
38 San Bonifacio
Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688 / US
02 / PRAVONG, Boun
2538 Kennedy Drive
Corona, CA 92879 / US
03 / HART, Charles, C.
126 Marvin Gardens
Summerville, SC 29483-8949 / US
04 / BRUSTAD, John, R.
34056 Formosa Drive
Dana Point, CA 92629 / US
05 / NGUYEN, Eric
574 Hancock Circle
Corona, CA 92879 / US
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Fitchett, Stuart Paul , et al
Saunders & Dolleymore LLP European Patent Attorneys 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford
WD18 0JU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Fitchett, Stuart Paul , et al
Saunders & Dolleymore 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford
Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB
Application number, filing date07783789.615.05.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007US68975
Priority number, dateUS20060747263P15.05.2006         Original published format: US 747263 P
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007134324
Date:22.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2026707
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/18
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/48]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:DILATATIONSKATHETERANORDNUNG MIT BIPOLAREM SCHNEIDELEMENT[2009/09]
English:DILATATION CATHETER ASSEMBLY WITH BIPOLAR CUTTING ELEMENT[2009/09]
French:ENSEMBLE DE CATHÉTER À DILATATION AVEC ÉLÉMENT DE DÉCOUPE BIPOLAIRE[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase25.09.2008National basic fee paid 
25.09.2008Search fee paid 
25.09.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
25.09.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.09.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
21.05.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.07.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
16.03.2010Application withdrawn by applicant  [2010/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US5904679  (CLAYMAN RALPH V [US]);
 [Y]US6287304  (EGGERS PHILIP E [US], et al);
 [A]US5035696  (RYDELL MARK A [US]);
 [Y]US5846239  (SWANSON DAVID K [US], et al)