Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023962

EP2023962 - Human oct-2 variant peptide chains, nucleic acids, and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/08]HUMAN OCT-2 VARIANT PEPTIDE CHAINS, NUCLEIC ACIDS, AND METHODS
[2012/44]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2014
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Janssen Biotech, Inc.
800/850 Ridgeview Drive
Horsham, PA 19044 / US
[2011/44]
Former [2009/33]For all designated states
Centocor Ortho Biotech Inc.
800/850 Ridgeview Drive
Horsham, PA 19044 / US
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Centocor, Inc.
200 Great Valley Parkway
Malvern, PA 19355 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DORAI, Haimanti
340 Long Ridge Lane
Exton, PA 19341 / US
02 / LU, Jin
3756 Old Post Circle
Boothwyn, PA 19061 / US
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Marshall, Cameron John , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2013/37]
Former [2009/51]Marshall, Cameron John , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2009/08]Marshall, Cameron John , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date07783878.717.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007US69151
Priority number, dateUS20060801127P17.05.2006         Original published format: US 801127 P
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007137121
Date:29.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2023962
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2023962
Date:11.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US17.07.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/47, C12N1/15, C12N1/21, C12N5/10
[2009/48]
Former International [2009/08]A61K51/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesAL17.12.2008
BA17.12.2008
HR17.12.2008
MK17.12.2008
RS17.12.2008
TitleGerman:Peptidketten aus humaner Oct-2-variante, Nukleinsäuren und Verfahren[2012/44]
English:Human oct-2 variant peptide chains, nucleic acids, and methods[2012/44]
French:Chaînes peptidiques de variants de l'oct-2 humain, acides nucléiques, et procédés[2012/44]
Former [2009/08]PEPTIDKETTEN AUS HUMANER OCT-2-VARIANTE, NUKLEINSÄUREN UND VERFAHREN
Former [2009/08]HUMAN OCT-2 VARIANT PEPTIDE CHAINS, NUCLEIC ACIDS, AND METHODS
Former [2009/08]CHAÎNES PEPTIDIQUES DE VARIANTS DE L'OCT-2 HUMAIN, ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES, ET PROCÉDÉS
Entry into regional phase17.12.2008National basic fee paid 
17.12.2008Search fee paid 
17.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
20.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2012Date of oral proceedings
16.11.2012Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
22.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.05.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
27.06.2013Fee for grant paid
27.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.01.2010
Opposition(s)12.06.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/34]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
27.06.2013Request for further processing filed
27.06.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.07.2013Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
24.10.2011Request for further processing filed
24.10.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.11.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.05.2007
AT11.09.2013
BG11.09.2013
CY11.09.2013
CZ11.09.2013
EE11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
MC11.09.2013
MT11.09.2013
PL11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
SK11.09.2013
TR11.09.2013
GR12.12.2013
IS11.01.2014
PT13.01.2014
IE17.05.2014
LU17.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU17.05.2007
AT11.09.2013
BG11.09.2013
CY11.09.2013
CZ11.09.2013
EE11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
MC11.09.2013
MT11.09.2013
PL11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
SK11.09.2013
GR12.12.2013
IS11.01.2014
PT13.01.2014
IE17.05.2014
LU17.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2016/25]AT11.09.2013
BG11.09.2013
CY11.09.2013
CZ11.09.2013
EE11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
MC11.09.2013
MT11.09.2013
PL11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
SK11.09.2013
GR12.12.2013
IS11.01.2014
PT13.01.2014
IE17.05.2014
LU17.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2016/16]AT11.09.2013
CY11.09.2013
CZ11.09.2013
EE11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
MC11.09.2013
MT11.09.2013
PL11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
SK11.09.2013
GR12.12.2013
IS11.01.2014
PT13.01.2014
IE17.05.2014
LU17.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/21]AT11.09.2013
CY11.09.2013
CZ11.09.2013
EE11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
MC11.09.2013
PL11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
SK11.09.2013
GR12.12.2013
IS11.01.2014
PT13.01.2014
IE17.05.2014
LU17.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/09]AT11.09.2013
CY11.09.2013
CZ11.09.2013
EE11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
MC11.09.2013
PL11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
SK11.09.2013
GR12.12.2013
IS11.01.2014
PT13.01.2014
LU17.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/08]AT11.09.2013
CY11.09.2013
CZ11.09.2013
EE11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
PL11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
SK11.09.2013
GR12.12.2013
IS11.01.2014
PT13.01.2014
LU17.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/04]AT11.09.2013
CY11.09.2013
CZ11.09.2013
EE11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
PL11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
SK11.09.2013
GR12.12.2013
IS11.01.2014
PT13.01.2014
LU17.05.2014
Former [2014/28]AT11.09.2013
CY11.09.2013
CZ11.09.2013
EE11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
PL11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
SK11.09.2013
GR12.12.2013
IS11.01.2014
PT13.01.2014
Former [2014/24]AT11.09.2013
CY11.09.2013
CZ11.09.2013
EE11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
PL11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
SK11.09.2013
GR12.12.2013
IS11.01.2014
Former [2014/23]CY11.09.2013
CZ11.09.2013
EE11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
SK11.09.2013
GR12.12.2013
IS11.01.2014
Former [2014/22]CY11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
RO11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
GR12.12.2013
Former [2014/18]CY11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
GR12.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY24.07.2013
FI11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
LV11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
SI11.09.2013
GR12.12.2013
Former [2014/11]CY24.07.2013
FI11.09.2013
LT11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
Former [2014/10]CY24.07.2013
LT11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
Former [2014/09]LT11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
Former [2014/08]LT11.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]  CLERC R G ET AL, "THE B CELL-SPECIFIC OCT-2 PROTEIN CONTAINS POU BOX AND HOMEO BOX-TYPE DOMAINS", GENES AND DEVELOPMENT, (1988), vol. 2, no. 12A, ISSN 0890-9369, pages 1570 - 1581, XP002550670 [X] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gad.2.12a.1570
 [A]  WIRTH T ET AL, "MULTIPLE OCT2 ISOFORMS ARE GENERATED BY ALTERNATIVE SPLICING", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 19, no. 1, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 43 - 52, XP002550671 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/19.1.43
 [A]  ZWILLING STEFAN ET AL, "The POU domains of the Oct1 and Oct2 transcription factors mediate specific interaction with TBP", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 22, no. 9, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 1655 - 1662, XP002550672 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/22.9.1655
 [A]  SÁEZ ANA-ISABEL ET AL, "Analysis of octamer-binding transcription factors Oct2 and Oct1 and their coactivator BOB.1/OBF.1 in lymphomas.", MODERN PATHOLOGY : AN OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADIAN ACADEMY OF PATHOLOGY, INC MAR 2002, (200203), vol. 15, no. 3, ISSN 0893-3952, pages 211 - 220, XP002550673 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/modpathol.3880518
 [A]  CORCORAN L M ET AL, "Oct-2, although not required for early B-cell development, is critical for later B-cell maturation and for postnatal survival.", GENES & DEVELOPMENT APR 1993, (199304), vol. 7, no. 4, ISSN 0890-9369, pages 570 - 582, XP002550674 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gad.7.4.570
 [A]  LIU YU-ZHEN ET AL, "Adjacent proline residues in the inhibitory domain of the Oct-2 transcription factor play distinct functional roles", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (19980515), vol. 26, no. 10, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 2464 - 2472, XP002550777 [A] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/26.10.2464
International search[X]WO2005017121  (EXELIXIS INC [US], et al);
 [A]  - CLERC, "The B-cell-specific Oct-2 protein contains POU box- and homeo box-type domains", GENES & DEV., (198812), vol. 2, pages 1570 - 1581, XP007102766
Examination   LILLYCROP K A ET AL, "Alternative splicing of the Oct-2 transcription factor RNA is differentially regulated in neuronal cells and B cells and results in protein isoforms with opposite effects on the activity of octamer/TAATGARAT-containing promoters.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 15 DEC 1992 LNKD- PUBMED:1281152, (19921215), vol. 267, no. 35, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 24960 - 24965,
    CORCORAN LYNN M ET AL, "All known in vivo functions of the Oct-2 transcription factor require the C-terminal protein domain.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (20040301), vol. 172, no. 5, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 2962 - 2969,
    ANNWEILER ARND ET AL, "Functional differences between the Oct2 transactivation domains determine the transactivation potential of individual Oct2 isoforms", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 22, no. 20, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 4250 - 4258,