Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020071

EP2020071 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MAXIMIZING THE OUTPUT OF VEHICLE ALTERNATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  29.05.2009
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.05.2009Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 01.07.2009  [2009/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RT Patent Company, Inc.
1209 Orange Street
Wilmington DE 19801 / US
[2009/06]
Inventor(s)01 / KOLOMEITSEV, Sergei, F.
870 North 980 West
Orem, UT 84057 / US
02 / GALLAGHER, Thomas, James
844 West 830 North
Orem, UT 84057 / US
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)Pawlyn, Anthony Neil
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/06]Pawlyn, Anthony Neil
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date07784035.322.05.2007
[2009/06]
WO2007US69463
Priority number, dateUS20060802469P22.05.2006         Original published format: US 802469 P
US2007075150021.05.2007         Original published format: US 751500
[2009/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007137259
Date:29.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2020071
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:H02H7/06, H02P9/00
[2009/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/06]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR MAXIMIERUNG DER LEISTUNG EINES FAHRZEUG-WECHSELRICHTERS[2009/06]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MAXIMIZING THE OUTPUT OF VEHICLE ALTERNATOR[2009/06]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DESTINÉS À MAXIMISER LA SORTIE D'UN ALTERNATEUR DE VÉHICULE[2009/06]
Entry into regional phase10.11.2008National basic fee paid 
10.11.2008Search fee paid 
10.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
10.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/06]
05.02.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.05.2009Application withdrawn by applicant  [2009/27]
Cited inInternational search[A]US7224148  (WATANABE KAZUYUKI [JP], et al);
 [A]US7116081  (WILSON SCOTT RICHARD [US]);
 [A]US6184661  (BECKER JAMES [US], et al);
 [A]US5481176  (DEBIASI CHARLES J [US], et al)