EP2021884 - AUTOMATED TUNING METHOD FOR MULTIVARIABLE MODEL PREDICTIVE CONTROLLERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell Asca Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states Honeywell Asca Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morriestown New Jersey 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAN, Junqiang 696 West 45th Ave, Apt. 226 Vancouver, British Columbia BC V5Z 2P8 / CA | 02 /
STEWART, Gregory, E. 4351 Arbutus Street Vancouver, British Columbia BC V6J 4S4 / CA | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2009/07] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07784060.1 | 23.05.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007US69515 | Priority number, date | US20060442572 | 25.05.2006 Original published format: US 442572 | [2009/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007140196 | Date: | 06.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2021884 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G05B13/04 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
G05B13/048 (EP,US);
G05B11/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, GB [2009/25] |
Former [2009/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTES EINSTELLVERFAHREN FÜR MULTIVARIABLE MODELLPRÄDIKTIVE STEUERUNG | [2009/07] | English: | AUTOMATED TUNING METHOD FOR MULTIVARIABLE MODEL PREDICTIVE CONTROLLERS | [2009/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SYNTONISATION AUTOMATISÉ POUR CONTRÔLEURS PRÉDICTIFS À MODÈLES MULTIVARIABLES | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 30.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/13] | 10.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5572420 (LU ZHUXIN J [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [X] - FAN J ET AL, "Two-dimensional frequency analysis for unconstrained model predictive control of cross-directional processes", AUTOMATICA, PERGAMON, (200411), vol. 40, no. 11, ISSN 0005-1098, pages 1891 - 1903, XP004558427 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.automatica.2004.07.002 | [DX] - LEE J H; YU Z H, "Tuning of model predictive controllers for robust performance", COMPUTERS & CHEMICAL ENGINEERING, GB, (199401), vol. 18, no. 1, pages 15 - 37, XP002464004 [DX] 1-10 * pages 15-16 * * pages 21-28 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0098-1354(94)85020-8 | [X] - TRIERWEILER, FARINA, "RPN tuning strategy for model predicitive control", JOURNAL OF PROCESS CONTROL, vol. 13(2003), (2002), pages 591 - 598, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/science?_ob=ArticleURL&_udi=B6V4N-487DK2J-1&_user=987766&_rdoc=1&_fmt=&_orig=search&_sort=d&view=c&_acct=C000049880&_version=1&_urlVersion=0&_userid=987766&md5=4baf5c5f65577e32d19749e69f9038e2, XP002464005 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0959-1524(02)00093-8 | [X] - VILANOVA R ET AL, "Observer-controller configuration approach to controller robustification", DECISION AND CONTROL, 1999. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 38TH IEEE CONFERENCE ON PHOENIX, AZ, USA 7-10 DEC. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19991207), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-5250-5, pages 74 - 75, XP010375525 [X] 7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CDC.1999.832750 |