Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023798

EP2023798 - SURGICAL RETRACTOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.02.2016
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG, CY, HU, SE, TR
published on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Globus Medical, Inc.
Valley Forge Business Center 2560 General Armistead Avenue
Audubon, PA 19403 / US
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / KARPOWICZ, Edward
318 Forest Lane
Swedesboro, NJ 08085 / US
02 / IOTT, Andrew
1714 Sherwood Cirle
Villanova, PA 19085 / US
 [2009/13]
Former [2009/08]01 / KARPOWICZ, Edward
318 Forest Lane
Swedesboro, NJ 08085 / US
02 / IOTT, Andrew
921 Trellis Lane
West Chester, PA 19380 / US
Representative(s)Susanetto, Carlo , et al
Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l.
Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18
35122 Padova / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/45]Susanetto, Carlo , et al
Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18
35122 Padova / IT
Former [2009/08]Susanetto, Carlo , et al
CANTALUPPI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via Matteotti, 26
35137 Padova / IT
Application number, filing date07784295.304.06.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007US70297
Priority number, dateUS2006042251106.06.2006         Original published format: US 422511
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007146630
Date:21.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2023798
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2023798
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.04.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.12.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/02, A61B19/00, A61B19/08, A61B1/32
[2014/49]
Former International [2009/08]A61B1/32
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:CHIRURGISCHES RETRAKTORSYSTEM[2009/08]
English:SURGICAL RETRACTOR SYSTEM[2009/08]
French:SYSTÈME ÉCARTEUR CHIRURGICAL[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase26.11.2008National basic fee paid 
26.11.2008Search fee paid 
26.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
06.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.03.2015Fee for grant paid
02.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.04.2010
Opposition(s)11.01.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
01.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.06.2007
AT08.04.2015
BG08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
TR08.04.2015
IE04.06.2015
LU04.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
FR30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2017/03]AT08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
IE04.06.2015
LU04.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
FR30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/25]AT08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
IE04.06.2015
LU04.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
FR30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/24]AT08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
IE04.06.2015
LU04.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/22]AT08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
IE04.06.2015
LU04.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/20]AT08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
IE04.06.2015
LU04.06.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/10]AT08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
PL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
LU04.06.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/09]AT08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/08]AT08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
IT08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/07]AT08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/50]ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/49]ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/42]NL08.04.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]US2005165281  (RAVIKUMAR SUNDARAM [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0015] - [0028] - [0031]; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]WO2005094695  (DEPUY SPINE INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-13 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - page 4, line 28 * * page 14, lines 4-6 *;
 [X]FR2807313  (MATERIEL ORTHOPEDIQUE EN ABREG [FR]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-10 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 2; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE20216712U  (GEISTER MEDIZINTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1195141  (DEPUY ACROMED INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *
International search[X]US2005215863  (RAVIKUMAR SUNDARAM [US], et al)