Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023757

EP2023757 - METHOD FOR MAKING A TREAD ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.02.2015
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2015No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.03.2015  [2015/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIKE Innovate C.V.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
[2014/32]
Former [2014/14]For all designated states
Nike International Ltd.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
NIKE International Ltd.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton OR 97005-6453 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JOHNSON, Jeffrey, L.
c/o Nike, Inc.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
02 / CHO, Jang, Rae
c/o Nike, Inc.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
 [2014/14]
Former [2009/08]01 / JOHNSON, Jeffrey, L.
c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
02 / CHO, Jang, Rae
c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
Representative(s)Liska, Horst , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Liska, Horst , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Former [2009/08]Liska, Horst , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820
D-81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date07784318.305.06.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007US70395
Priority number, dateUS2006042225405.06.2006         Original published format: US 422254
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007143645
Date:13.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2023757
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2023757
Date:02.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.05.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:A43B13/04, B29D35/14, B29D35/00
[2013/42]
Former International [2009/08]A43B13/04, B29D31/50
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/37]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER LAUFFLÄCHENANORDNUNG[2009/08]
English:METHOD FOR MAKING A TREAD ASSEMBLY[2009/08]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ENSEMBLE SEMELLE[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase05.12.2008National basic fee paid 
05.12.2008Search fee paid 
05.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
20.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2014Fee for grant paid
14.02.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP14155122.6  / EP2745723
EP14183593.4  / EP2857185
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.11.2013
Opposition(s)06.01.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
10.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH06113901  (ASICS CORP) [Y] 14-17 * abstract *;
 [Y]US4309376  (UENO YOSHIO, et al) [Y] 14-17 * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 45; figures 6a-6c *
International search[Y]US5725823  (FINN NORMAN H [US], et al);
 [Y]US1405453  (SOMERVILLE ALBERT A);
 [Y]US4309376  (UENO YOSHIO, et al);
 [Y]  - BERINS M.L., Plastics Engineering Handbook of the Society of the Plastics Industry, NEW YORK, VAN NOSTRAND REINHOLD, (1991), vol. 5TH ED., XP008104929