Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2054112

EP2054112 - INJECTION DEVICE WITH CLAW-TYPE SECURING MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.02.2011
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.09.2016Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 19.10.2016  [2016/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tecpharma Licensing AG
Brunnmattstrasse 6
3401 Burgdorf / CH
[2009/19]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHRUL, Christian
Bernstrasse 25
3400 Burgdorf / CH
02 / TSCHIRREN, Markus
Hauptstrasse 2
3422 Kirchberg / CH
 [2009/19]
Representative(s)SSM Sandmair
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/20]Gassenhuber, Andreas , et al
Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16
81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date07785091.514.08.2007
[2009/19]
WO2007CH00396
Priority number, dateDE2006103810114.08.2006         Original published format: DE102006038101
[2009/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008019517
Date:21.02.2008
Language:DE
[2008/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2054112
Date:06.05.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2008
[2009/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2054112
Date:30.03.2011
Language:DE
[2011/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/315
[2009/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/19]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:INJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT KLAUENSICHERUNG[2009/19]
English:INJECTION DEVICE WITH CLAW-TYPE SECURING MEANS[2009/19]
French:DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION DOTÉ D'UNE FIXATION À GRIFFES[2009/19]
Entry into regional phase16.03.2009National basic fee paid 
16.03.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
16.03.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/19]
11.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2011Fee for grant paid
14.02.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.12.2011  03.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Opponent's representative
Weilnau, Carsten
Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unter den Eichen 5
65195 Wiesbaden / DE
 [2016/42]
Former [2012/05]
Opponent(s)01  23.12.2011   
Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Opponent's representative
Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
07.02.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.08.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.12.2014Date of oral proceedings
18.02.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.02.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition24.04.2015Appeal received No.  T0892/15
29.06.2015Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
DK30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
HU30.03.2011
IE30.03.2011
IT30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
MT30.03.2011
NL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
TR30.03.2011
BG30.06.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
LU14.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
AT31.08.2012
[2013/48]
Former [2013/45]CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
DK30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
HU30.03.2011
IE30.03.2011
IT30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
MT30.03.2011
NL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
TR30.03.2011
BG30.06.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
LU14.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2013/44]CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
DK30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
IE30.03.2011
IT30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
MT30.03.2011
NL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
TR30.03.2011
BG30.06.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
LU14.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2013/29]CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
DK30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
IE30.03.2011
IT30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
MT30.03.2011
NL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
BG30.06.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
LU14.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2012/05]CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
MT30.03.2011
NL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
Former [2012/02]CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
NL30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
Former [2011/50]CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
IS30.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
Former [2011/49]CY30.03.2011
CZ30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
RO30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
SK30.03.2011
GR01.07.2011
ES11.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
Former [2011/47]CY30.03.2011
EE30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
GR01.07.2011
PT01.08.2011
Former [2011/37]CY30.03.2011
FI30.03.2011
LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
SI30.03.2011
GR01.07.2011
Former [2011/36]LT30.03.2011
LV30.03.2011
SE30.03.2011
GR01.07.2011
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2004006997  (TECPHARMA LICENSING AG [CH], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO03053499  (DISETRONIC LICENSING AG [CH], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]WO0041752  (DISETRONIC LICENSING AG [CH], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2005072796  (TECPHARMA LICENSING AG [CH], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0937471  (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *