Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2064553

EP2064553 - DIAGNOSTIC TEST TO EXCLUDE SIGNIFICANT RENAL INJURY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.08.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG, HU, TR
published on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Antibodyshop A/S
Tuborg Havnevej 15, st.
2900 Hellerup / DK
[2014/51]
Former [2009/23]For all designated states
Antibodyshop A/S
Grusbakken 8
2820 Gentofte / DK
Inventor(s)01 / UTTENTHAL, Lars Otto
Calle Maestro Avila 3-3-c
E-37002 Salamanca / ES
02 / BANGERT, Kristian
Arnevangen 58
DK-2840 Holte / DK
 [2009/23]
Representative(s)Høiberg P/S
Adelgade 12
1304 Copenhagen K / DK
[N/P]
Former [2014/36]Høiberg A/S
St. Kongensgade 59 A
1264 Copenhagen K / DK
Former [2009/26]HOEIBERG A/S
European Patent & Trademark Attorneys Store Kongensgade 59 A
1264 Copenhagen K / DK
Former [2009/23]HOEIBERG A/S
Store Kongensgade 59A
1264 Copenhagen K / DK
Application number, filing date07785730.803.08.2007
[2009/23]
WO2007DK00366
Priority number, dateUS20060836088P07.08.2006         Original published format: US 836088 P
[2009/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008017306
Date:14.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2064553
Date:03.06.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2008
[2009/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2064553
Date:03.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/68
[2009/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DIAGNOSTISCHER TEST ZUM AUSSCHLIESSEN EINER SIGNIFIKANTEN NIERENVERLETZUNG[2009/23]
English:DIAGNOSTIC TEST TO EXCLUDE SIGNIFICANT RENAL INJURY[2009/23]
French:TEST DE DIAGNOSTIC POUR EXCLURE UNE IMPORTANTE LÉSION RÉNALE[2009/23]
Entry into regional phase09.03.2009National basic fee paid 
09.03.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
09.03.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/23]
24.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.01.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.02.2014
06.02.2014Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
20.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
02.07.2014Fee for grant paid
02.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP13157838.7  / EP2602624
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.02.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.06.2015  09.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Gentian AS
P.O. Box 733
1509 Moss / NO
Opponent's representative
Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Sternwartstrasse 4
81679 München / DE
 [2015/29]
10.07.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.01.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.07.2016Date of oral proceedings
13.07.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.08.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition06.10.2016Appeal received No.  T2306/16
21.12.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
03.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
15.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
13.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
24.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.08.2007
AT03.09.2014
BE03.09.2014
BG03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
MT03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
TR03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
IE03.08.2015
LU03.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2017/22]AT03.09.2014
BE03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
MT03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
IE03.08.2015
LU03.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/33]AT03.09.2014
BE03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
IE03.08.2015
LU03.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/22]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
LU03.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/18]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
LU03.08.2015
Former [2016/17]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
LU03.08.2015
Former [2015/50]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/34]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/24]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/23]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/22]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/16]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
Former [2015/12]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
Former [2015/10]ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
Former [2015/09]FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
Former [2015/08]LT03.09.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2004088276  (CHILDRENS HOSP MEDICAL CENTER [US], et al) [X] 1-14,1-14,1-14 * paragraphs [0036] , [0043] , [0044]; examples 5,6 * * paragraphs [0036] , [0043] , [0044]; examples 5,6 * * paragraphs [0036] , [0043] , [0044]; examples 5,6 *;
 [X]WO2006066587  (ANTIBODYSHOP AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-14,1-14,1-14 * paragraphs [0064] , [0067]; claim 11 * * paragraphs [0064] , [0067]; claim 11 * * paragraphs [0064] , [0067]; claim 11 *;
 [X]  - MISHRA J ET AL, "Identification of neutrophil gelatinase-associated lipocalin as a novel early urinary biomarker for ischemic renal injury", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF NEPHROLOGY, WILLIAMS AND WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (200310), vol. 14, no. 10, ISSN 1046-6673, pages 2534 - 2543, XP002377943 [X] 1-14,1-14,1-14 * page 2534 * * page 2534 * * page 2534 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/01.ASN.0000088027.54400.C6
 [X]  - MISHRA J ET AL, Neutrophil gelatinase-associated lipocalin (NGAL) as a biomarker for acute renal injury after cardiac surgery, LANCET THE, LANCET LIMITED. LONDON, GB, PAGE(S) 1231-1238, (20050402), ISSN 0140-6736, XP004824250 [X] 1-14,1-14,1-14 * page 1231 * * page 1231 * * page 1231 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(05)74811-X
 [PX]  - BANGERT ET AL, NGAL is significantly increased in urine and plasma in acute renal failure, INTENSIVE CARE MEDICINE ;, SPRINGER-VERLAG, BE, PAGE(S) S10, (200609), ISSN 1432-1238, XP009091902 [PX] 1-14,1-14,1-14 * abstract * * abstract * * abstract *
 [PX]  - BANGERT K ET AL, NGAL as a marker for renal injury in sepsis, IMFLAMMATION RESEARCH, BIRKHAEUSER VERLAG, BASEL, CH, PAGE(S) S104-S105, (200703), ISSN 1023-3830, XP008082913 [PX] 1-14,1-14,1-14 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *
ExaminationWO2007137584
by applicantWO2006066587