Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2046239

EP2046239 - METHOD FOR HEATING A PRE-WARMED MUFFLE USED FOR DENTAL CERAMICS IN A DENTAL FURNACE AND CONTROL DEVICE AND FURNACE CONTAINING SAID DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.12.2010
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zubler Gerätebau GmbH
Buchbrunnenweg 26
89081 Ulm-Jungingen / DE
[2009/16]
Inventor(s)01 / ZUBLER, Kurt
Ginsterweg 28
89233 Neu-Ulm / DE
 [2009/16]
Representative(s)Fiener, Josef , et al
Patentanw. J. Fiener et col.
P.O. Box 12 49
87712 Mindelheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/16]Fiener, Josef , et al
Patentanw. J. Fiener et col., P.O. Box 12 49
87712 Mindelheim / DE
Application number, filing date07786488.201.08.2007
[2009/16]
WO2007EP06800
Priority number, dateDE2006103613201.08.2006         Original published format: DE102006036132
[2009/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008014989
Date:07.02.2008
Language:DE
[2008/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2046239
Date:15.04.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2008
[2009/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2046239
Date:12.01.2011
Language:DE
[2011/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61C13/20
[2009/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/16]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM AUFHEIZEN EINER FÜR DENTALKERAMIK VERWENDETEN, VORGEWÄRMTEN PRESSMUFFEL IN EINEM PRESSOFEN SOWIE STEUERVORRICHTUNG UND DIESE ENTHALTENDER OFEN[2009/16]
English:METHOD FOR HEATING A PRE-WARMED MUFFLE USED FOR DENTAL CERAMICS IN A DENTAL FURNACE AND CONTROL DEVICE AND FURNACE CONTAINING SAID DEVICE[2009/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR CHAUFFER UN MOUFLE DE PRESSAGE PRÉCHAUFFÉ UTILISÉ POUR DE LA CÉRAMIQUE DENTAIRE DANS UN FOUR DE PRESSAGE AINSI QUE DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ET FOUR LE CONTENANT[2009/16]
Entry into regional phase17.02.2009National basic fee paid 
17.02.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
17.02.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.02.2009Examination requested  [2009/16]
24.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.11.2010Fee for grant paid
23.11.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.10.2011   
Ivoclar Vivadent AG
Bendererstrasse 2
FL-9494 Schaan / LI
Opponent's representative
Baronetzky, Klaus
Splanemann
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Rumfordstrasse 7
80469 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2011/46]
Opponent(s)01  07.10.2011   
Ivoclar Vivadent AG
Bendererstrasse 2
FL-9494 Schaan / LI
Opponent's representative
Baronetzky, Klaus
Splanemann Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft Rumfordstrasse 7
80469 München / DE
17.11.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.05.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
21.10.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.10.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition27.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0162/17
27.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY12.01.2011
CZ12.01.2011
DK12.01.2011
EE12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
IE12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
MT12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
SE12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
SK12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
GR13.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
LU01.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
GB01.08.2014
TR01.08.2014
HU02.08.2014
[2017/46]
Former [2017/35]CY12.01.2011
CZ12.01.2011
DK12.01.2011
EE12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
IE12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
MT12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
SE12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
SK12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
GR13.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
LU01.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
GB01.08.2014
HU02.08.2014
Former [2017/24]CY12.01.2011
CZ12.01.2011
DK12.01.2011
EE12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
IE12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
MT12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
SE12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
SK12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
GR13.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
LU01.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
GB01.08.2014
HU02.08.2014
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2015/36]CY12.01.2011
CZ12.01.2011
DK12.01.2011
EE12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
IE12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
MT12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
SE12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
SK12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
GR13.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
LU01.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
GB01.08.2014
HU02.08.2014
Former [2015/23]CY12.01.2011
CZ12.01.2011
DK12.01.2011
EE12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
IE12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
MT12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
SE12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
SK12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
GR13.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
LU01.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
HU02.08.2014
Former [2015/22]CY12.01.2011
CZ12.01.2011
DK12.01.2011
EE12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
IE12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
MT12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
SE12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
SK12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
GR13.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
LU01.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2011/38]CY12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
SE12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
GR13.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
Former [2011/37]CY12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
SE12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
GR13.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
Former [2011/36]LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
SE12.01.2011
GR13.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
Cited inInternational search[XA]US6303059  (FOSER HANS-PETER [LI], et al) [X] 9-11 * column 4, lines 1,2,45-53 * * column 6, lines 24-38 * * figures 4,5 * [A] 1;
 [X]WO2005116557  (DEKEMA DENTAL KERAMIKOEFEN GMB [DE], et al) [X] 9-11 * page 6, paragraph 2 *;
 [XA]DE3831539  (KALTENBACH & VOIGT [DE]) [X] 9-11 * page 13, lines 21-37; claim 1 * * figures 8,9,14-16 * [A] 1;
 [X]DE3732041  (ZUBLER KURT [DE]) [X] 9-11 * claim 1 *;
 [A]DE1926875  (HINTERBERGER DR KARL) [A] 1 * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 25 * * figure 3 *
by applicantUS6303059