Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2031986

EP2031986 - INDUCTION OF TOLERANCE TO EGG PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.02.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
10.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Société des Produits Nestlé S.A.
Entre-deux-Villes
1800 Vevey / CH
[2019/28]
Former [2017/42]For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [2013/12]For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [2009/11]For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Inventor(s)01 / FRITSCHE, Rodolphe
Chemin de la Chaumény 48
1814 La Tour-de-peilz / CH
02 / SCHALLER, Raphael
130 Grand Chemin
1066 Epalinges / CH
 [2009/11]
Representative(s)Santarelli
49, avenue des Champs-Elysées
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]O'Gara, Margaret Mary , et al
Santarelli
49, avenue des Champs Elysées
FR-75008 Paris / FR
Former [2014/25]Künzi, Sophie
Nestec S.A.
CT-IAM
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [2013/15]Corticchiato, Olivier
Nestec S.A.
CT-IAM
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [2011/45]Cogniat, Eric Jean Marie
Nestec S.A. IP Department Av. Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [2009/11]Corticchiato, Olivier
Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Application number, filing date07786738.014.06.2007
[2009/11]
WO2007EP55882
Priority number, dateEP2006011553315.06.2006         Original published format: EP 06115533
[2009/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007144397
Date:21.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2031986
Date:11.03.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007
[2009/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2031986
Date:20.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/305, A61K38/01, A61P37/08
[2009/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/11]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:INDUKTION DER VERTRÄGLICHKEIT ZUR EIPROTEINEN[2012/48]
English:INDUCTION OF TOLERANCE TO EGG PROTEINS[2009/11]
French:INDUCTION DE LA TOLÉRANCE AUX PROTÉINES D'OEUF[2012/48]
Former [2009/11]HERBEIFÜHRUNG VON TOLERANZ GEGEN EIPROTEINE
Former [2009/11]INDUCTION DE LA TOLÉRANCE AUX PROTÉINES D' UF
Entry into regional phase15.01.2009National basic fee paid 
15.01.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.01.2009Examination requested  [2009/11]
04.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.2013Fee for grant paid
05.02.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.06.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.12.2013  14.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
400 Southwest 8th Street
Topeka, Kansas 66603 / US
Opponent's representative
Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
 02  17.12.2013  14.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
N.V. Nutricia
Eerste Stationsstraat 186
2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL
Opponent's representative
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
 [2018/27]
Former [2014/04]
Opponent(s)01  17.12.2013   
Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
400 Southwest 8th Street
Topeka, Kansas 66603 / US
Opponent's representative
Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
 02  17.12.2013   
N.V. Nutricia
Eerste Stationsstraat 186
2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL
Opponent's representative
van Duijvenbode, René Cornelis
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
28.01.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.10.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
04.05.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.05.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition30.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1544/16
14.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
13.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.06.2007
AT20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
MT20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
IE14.06.2013
LU14.06.2013
BG20.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
FI14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
ES15.06.2017
SE15.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
PT14.12.2017
GR11.01.2018
[2019/13]
Former [2019/11]HU14.06.2007
AT20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
MT20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
IE14.06.2013
LU14.06.2013
BG20.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
FI14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
SE15.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
PT14.12.2017
GR11.01.2018
Former [2018/39]HU14.06.2007
AT20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
MT20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
IE14.06.2013
LU14.06.2013
BG20.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
FI14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
SE15.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
PT14.12.2017
GR11.01.2018
Former [2018/25]HU14.06.2007
AT20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
MT20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
IE14.06.2013
LU14.06.2013
BG20.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
FI14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
SE15.06.2017
PT14.12.2017
GR11.01.2018
Former [2018/14]HU14.06.2007
AT20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
MT20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
IE14.06.2013
LU14.06.2013
BG20.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
FI14.06.2017
SE15.06.2017
PT14.12.2017
Former [2018/08]HU14.06.2007
AT20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
MT20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
IE14.06.2013
LU14.06.2013
BG20.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
FI14.06.2017
Former [2015/34]HU14.06.2007
AT20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
MT20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
IE14.06.2013
LU14.06.2013
BG20.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
Former [2015/13]AT20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
MT20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
IE14.06.2013
BG20.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
Former [2014/20]AT20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
IE14.06.2013
BG20.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
Former [2014/09]AT20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
Former [2014/08]AT20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
Former [2013/52]AT20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
Former [2013/49]AT20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
Former [2013/48]AT20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
IS20.07.2013
Former [2013/38]LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
Former [2013/37]LT20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
Former [2013/34]LT20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
Former [2013/33]LT20.03.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]US2002037357  (FRITSCHE RODOLPHE [CH], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0013] , [0016] , [0021] - [0025] - [0027] , [0034] , [0038] , [0042] , [0044] , [0045] *;
 [X]WO9700078  (VALIO OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 1, lines 5-12 * * page 3, line 36 - page 4, line 28 * * page 5, lines 1-10 *;
 [A]EP0629350  (SANDOZ NUTRITION LTD [CH]) [A] 1-5 * page 3, lines 23-29,50 *;
 [A]EP0827697  (NESTLE SA [CH]) [A] 1-5 * column 3, lines 26-48 *;
 [A]  - FRITSCHE ET AL, "Induction of systemic immunologic tolerance to beta-lactoglobulin by oral administration of a whey protein hydrolysate", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, MOSBY - YEARLY BOOK, INC, US, (199708), vol. 100, no. 2, ISSN 0091-6749, pages 266 - 273, XP005189327 [A] 1-5 * page 266, column 2, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0091-6749(97)70235-5
 [A]  - STRANSKY B, FARIA AMC, VAZ NM, "Oral tolerance with altered forms of ovalbumin", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1998), Database accession no. PREV199800276511, XP002402551 [A] 1-5 * column A *