Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2046318

EP2046318 - Combination of adapalene and benzoyl peroxide for treating inflammatory acne lesions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/16]COMBINATION OF ADAPALENE AND BENZOYL PEROXIDE FOR TREATING ACNE LESIONS
[2013/04]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.05.2013
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
13.08.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Galderma Research & Development
2400 Route des Colles Les Templiers
06410 Biot / FR
[2013/08]
Former [2009/16]For all designated states
Galderma Research & Development
Les Templiers 2400 Route des Colles
06410 Biot / FR
Inventor(s)01 / ABOU-CHACRA VERNET, Marie-line
133 avenue Sainte Marguerite
Les Bergeronnettes Bât A2
F-06200 Nice / FR
02 / GROSS, Denis
342 chemin des Bruyères
F-83440 Callian / FR
03 / LOESCHE, Christian
1 Place des Cines
F-06560 Valbonne / FR
04 / PONCET, Michel
87 allée de l Orme
Domaine du Colombier
F-06250 Mougins / FR
 [2013/23]
Former [2009/16]01 / ABOU-CHACRA VERNET, Marie-line
133 avenue Sainte Marguerite Les Bergeronnettes Bât A2
F-06200 Nice / FR
02 / GROSS, Denis
342 chemin des Bruyères
F-83440 Callian / FR
03 / LOESCHE, Christian
1 Place des Cines
F-06560 Valbonne / FR
04 / PONCET, Michel
87 allée de l Orme Domaine du Colombier
F-06250 Mougins / FR
Representative(s)Casalonga
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstraße 71/73
80335 München / DE
[2012/46]
Former [2012/06]Boulard, Denis
L'Oreal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Auglagnier
92665 Asnieres-sur-Seine / FR
Former [2009/50]Allab, Myriam
L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier
92600 Asnières / FR
Former [2009/16]Allab, Myriam
L'Oreal - D.I.P.I. River Plaza 25-29 Quai Aulagnier
92665 Asnières-sur-Seine / FR
Application number, filing date07787478.212.07.2007
[2009/16]
WO2007EP57207
Priority number, dateFR2006005296813.07.2006         Original published format: FR 0652968
US20060833491P27.07.2006         Original published format: US 833491 P
[2009/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008006888
Date:17.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2046318
Date:15.04.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2008
[2009/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2046318
Date:05.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/192, A61K31/327, A61P17/10, A61K9/00
[2013/04]
Former International [2009/16]A61K31/192, A61P17/10, A61K31/327, A61K9/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/16]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Kombination von Adapalen und Benzoylperoxid zur Behandlung von entzündlichen Akneläsionen[2013/04]
English:Combination of adapalene and benzoyl peroxide for treating inflammatory acne lesions[2013/04]
French:Combinaison d'adapalène et de peroxyde de benzoyle pour le traitement de lésions inflammatoires de l'acné[2013/04]
Former [2009/16]KOMBINATION AUS ADAPALEN UND BENZOLPEROXID ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON AKNELÄSIONEN
Former [2009/16]COMBINATION OF ADAPALENE AND BENZOYL PEROXIDE FOR TREATING ACNE LESIONS
Former [2009/16]ADAPALÈNE ET PEROXYDE DE BENZOYLE COMBINÉS UTILISÉS DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE LÉSIONS DUES À L'ACNÉ
Entry into regional phase13.02.2009National basic fee paid 
13.02.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
13.02.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.02.2009Examination requested  [2009/16]
25.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2012Date of oral proceedings
15.01.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
21.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2013Fee for grant paid
24.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12152317.9  / EP2450035
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.01.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.03.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan)
Building 4
Trident Place
Mosquito Way
Hatfield
Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 [2016/32]
Former [2015/47]
Opponent(s)01  05.03.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
Former [2014/15]
Opponent(s)01  05.03.2014   
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Alison
Alison Gallafent Ltd
4 George Street
Llandeilo Dyfed
SA19 6AS / GB
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
09.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.10.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
26.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.04.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition23.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1500/16
05.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
06.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]FR2833841  (GALDERMA RES & DEV [FR]) [X] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [PX]WO2007002831  (STIEFEL LABORATORIES [US], et al) [PX] 1-22 * example 5 *
 [X]  - FROM CIRD GALDERMA ET AL, "Skin tolerance of adapalene 0.1% gel in combination with other topical antiacne treatments", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF DERMATOLOGY, C.V. MOSBY, ST. LOUIS, MO, US, (199706), vol. 36, no. 6, ISSN 0190-9622, pages S113 - S115, XP005177985 [X] 1-22 * the whole document *
 [X]  - MARTIN B ET AL, "CHEMICAL STABILITY OF ADAPALENE AND TRETINOIN WHEN COMBINED WITH BENZOYL PEROXIDE IN PRESENCE AND IN ABSENCE OF VISBILE LIGHT AND ULTRAVIOLET RADIATION", BRITISH JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY, (199810), vol. 139, no. SUPPL 52, ISSN 0007-0963, pages 8 - 11, XP008007635 [X] 1-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2133.1998.1390s2008.x
 [X]  - KORKUT C ET AL, "BENZOYL PEROXIDE, ADAPALENE, AND THEIR COMBINATION IN THE TREATMENT OF ACNE VULGARIS", JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY, JAPANESE DERMATOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION, TOKYO, JP, (2005), vol. 32, no. 3, ISSN 0385-2407, pages 169 - 173, XP009075640 [X] 1-22 * page 170 *
 [X]  - WEISS ET AL, "Adapalene for the treatment of acne vulgaris", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF DERMATOLOGY, C.V. MOSBY, ST. LOUIS, MO, US, (199808), vol. 39, no. 2, ISSN 0190-9622, pages S50 - S54, XP005177891 [X] 1-22 * page S50, column 2 * * page S51, column 1 *
 [X]  - "Evaluation of a maintenance treatment of acne vulgaris with adapalene gel 0.1%", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF DERMATOLOGY, C.V. MOSBY, ST. LOUIS, MO, US, (200503), vol. 52, no. 3, ISSN 0190-9622, page P18, XP004840270 [X] 1-22 * abstract *
 [X]  - CAPIZZI ET AL, "SKIN TOLERABILITY AND EFFICACY OF COMBINATION THERAPY WITH HYDROGEN PEROXIDE STABILIZED CREAM AND ADAPALENE GEL IN COMPARISON WITH BENZOYL PEROXIDE CREAM AND ADAPALENE GEL IN COMMON ACNE. A RANDOMIZED, INVESTIGATOR-MASKED, CONTROLLED TRIAL", BRITISH JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY, XX, XX, (2004), vol. 151, no. 2, ISSN 0007-0963, pages 481 - 484, XP008073258 [X] 1-22 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2133.2004.06067.x
 [X]  - CLUCAS A ET AL, "Adapalene 0.1% gel has low skin irritation potential", JEADV. JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN ACADEMY OF DERMATOLOGY AND VENEREOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (199809), vol. 11, ISSN 0926-9959, page S275, XP004556097 [X] 1-22 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0926-9959(98)95626-4
 [X]  - BIKOWSKI JOSEPH B, "Clinical experience results with clindamycin 1% benzoyl peroxide 5% gel (Duac) as monotherapy and in combination.", JOURNAL OF DRUGS IN DERMATOLOGY : JDD 2005 MAR-APR, (200503), vol. 4, no. 2, ISSN 1545-9616, pages 164 - 171, XP009079917 [X] 1-22 * the whole document *
 [X]  - BRAND BARBARA ET AL, "Cumulative irritancy comparison of adapalene gel 0.1% versus other retinoid products when applied in combination with topical antimicrobial agents.", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF DERMATOLOGY SEP 2003, (200309), vol. 49, no. 3 Suppl, ISSN 0190-9622, pages S227 - S232, XP002422710 [X] 1-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1067/S0190-9622(03)01151-4
 [X]  - FU WEN-WEN ET AL, "Clinical efficacy and safety of 5% benzoyl peroxide gel combined with 0.1% adapalene gel in the treatment of acne vulgaris: A multicenter, randomised study.", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200306), Database accession no. PREV200300514701, XP002422712 [X] 1-22 * abstract *
    [ ] - ZHONGHUA PIFUKE ZAZHI, (200306), vol. 36, no. 6, ISSN 0412-4030, pages 310 - 312
 [X]  - HURWITZ S, "THE COMBINED EFFECT OF VITAMIN A ACID AND BENZOYL PEROXIDE IN THE TREATMENT OF ACNE", CUTIS, EXCERPTA MEDICA, BELLE MEAD,NJ, US, (1976), vol. 17, no. 3, ISSN 0011-4162, pages 585 - 590, XP008007633 [X] 1-22 * the whole document *
ExaminationWO2007132134