Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2047235

EP2047235 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MONITORING A COMBUSTION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.07.2013
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.08.2013  [2013/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Building Technologies HVAC Products GmbH
Berliner Ring 23
76437 Rastatt / DE
[2009/16]
Inventor(s)01 / HANGAUER, Wilfried
Favoritestrasse 44
76437 Rastatt / DE
02 / LINK, Hans
Vormberger Str. 27
76547 Sinzheim / DE
03 / LOCHSCHMIED, Rainer
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 46 a
76287 Rheinstetten-Forchheim / DE
 [2009/16]
Representative(s)Maier, Daniel Oliver , et al
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/17]Maier, Daniel Oliver , et al
Siemens Schweiz AG TI IP Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2009/16]Weise, Wolfgang
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date07788262.906.08.2007
[2009/16]
WO2007EP58151
Priority number, dateDE2006103656304.08.2006         Original published format: DE102006036563
[2009/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008015292
Date:07.02.2008
Language:DE
[2008/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2047235
Date:15.04.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2008
[2009/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/39, F23N5/00
[2009/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES VERBRENNUNGSPROZESSES[2009/16]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MONITORING A COMBUSTION PROCESS[2009/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA SURVEILLANCE D'UN PROCESSUS DE COMBUSTION[2009/16]
Entry into regional phase13.01.2009National basic fee paid 
13.01.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
13.01.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.01.2009Examination requested  [2009/16]
07.04.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.02.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/35]
03.04.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/35]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.10.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
20.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201206   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0766080  (FINMECCANICA SPA [IT]) [X] 1,10-15,17 * column 1, lines 5-11 * * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 2 * * column 6, line 59 - column 7, line 17 * * column 7, line 47 - column 10, line 24 * * figure 2 * * column 11, lines 5-15 * [Y] 2-9,18;
 [X]US5252060  (MCKINNON J THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * column 1, lines 7-11 * * column 5, line 47 - column 6, line 53 * * column 7, lines 1-52 * * figures 2,5,6 *;
 [Y]US4435149  (ASTHEIMER ROBERT W [US]) [Y] 2-4 * abstract *;
 [Y]  - MARK G ALLEN ET AL, "REVIEW ARTICLE; Diode laser absorption sensors for gas-dynamic and combustion flows", MEASUREMENT SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (19980401), vol. 9, no. 4, ISSN 0957-0233, pages 545 - 562, XP020064485 [Y] 5-9,18 * page 549 - page 550 * * page 559 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-0233/9/4/001