EP2024840 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR PROCESSING TRANSACTIONS IN A FLASH TYPE MEMORY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.01.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coriant Oy Sinimäentie 6 02630 Espoo / FI | [2014/52] |
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Tellabs Oy Sinikalliontie 7 02630 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALLIVUORI, Matti Seilimäki 12 i 02180 Espoo / FI | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Finnpatent Oy Smart Chemistry Park Raisionkaari 55 21200 Raisio / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 Antinkatu 3 C 00101 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2009/08] | Konkonen, Tomi-Matti Juhani Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 07788705.7 | 07.06.2007 | [2009/08] | WO2007FI00162 | Priority number, date | FI20060000571 | 08.06.2006 Original published format: FI 20060571 | [2009/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007141375 | Date: | 13.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2024840 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 13.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/02, G11C16/02 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06F12/0246 (FI,US);
G06F11/1471 (US);
G06F11/1474 (US);
G06F9/466 (US);
G06F9/467 (US);
G06Q20/346 (EP,US);
G06Q20/35765 (EP,US);
G07F7/084 (EP,US);
G07F7/1008 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON TRANSAKTIONEN IN EINER FLASH-SPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | [2009/08] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR PROCESSING TRANSACTIONS IN A FLASH TYPE MEMORY DEVICE | [2009/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET AGENCEMENT POUR TRAITER DES TRANSACTIONS DANS UN DISPOSITIF DE MÉMOIRE DE TYPE FLASH | [2009/08] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 11.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.11.2017 | 27.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 31.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/25] | 10.02.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2005286306 (SRINIVASAN SUJAYA [US], et al) [X] 1-3,15 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0017] , [0018] , [0026] , [0029] , [0033] - [0038] * [A] 4-14; | [A]WO0131458 (TELLABS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * claim 1 *; | [A]US2006018227 (NAKAJIMA ISAMU [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP1510924 (ADVANCED RISC MACH LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US6236593 (HONG SUNG-IN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]WO9844420 (LEXAR MEDIA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [AE]WO2007100197 (FUSIONSOFT CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]US2005286306 (SRINIVASAN SUJAYA [US], et al); | [A]US2005216653 (AASHEIM JERED D [US], et al); | [A]EP1510924 (ADVANCED RISC MACH LTD [GB]) | by applicant | WO0131458 | US2005286306 |