Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027300

EP2027300 - STEEL COMPOSITIONS FOR SPECIAL USES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.12.2016
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.04.2017Revocation of patentpublished on 10.05.2017  [2017/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
V & M FRANCE
27 Avenue du Géneral Leclerc
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / FOUQUET, Annie
2 route de Marbaix
59550 Taisnieres en Thierache / FR
02 / PETELOT, Catheline
2 route de Marbaix
59550 Taisnieres en Thierache / FR
03 / PETELOT, Emilie
2 route de Marbaix
59550 Taisnieres en Thierache / FR
04 / PETELOT, Adeline
2 route de Marbaix
59550 Taisnieres en Thierache / FR
05 / LEPINGLE, Viviane
14 rue des Saules
62112 Corbehem / FR
06 / LOUIS, Ghislain
1 Chemin du Vaillant
59230 Chateau L'Abbaye / FR
07 / PETELOT Daniel (décédé)
2 route de Marbaix
F-59550 TAISNIERES-EN-THIERACHE / FR
08 / LEYER Jean
9 avenue de Liège
F-59300 VALENCIENNES / FR
09 / VANDENBERGHE Bruno
1 rue Paul Eluard
F-59264 ONNAING / FR
 [2012/46]
Former [2011/30]01 / FOUQUET, Annie
2 route de Marbaix
59550 Taisnieres en Thierache / FR
02 / PETELOT, Catheline
2 route de Marbaix
59550 Taisnieres en Thierache / FR
03 / PETELOT, Emilie
2 route de Marbaix
59550 Taisnieres en Thierache / FR
04 / PETELOT, Adeline
2 route de Marbaix
59550 Taisnieres en Thierache / FR
05 / LEPINGLE, Viviane
14 rue des Saules
62112 Corbehem / FR
06 / LOUIS, Ghislain
1 Chemin du Vaillant
59230 Chateau L'Abbaye / FR
Former [2009/09]01 / FOUQUET, Annnie
2 route de Marbaix
59550 Taisnieres en Thierache / FR
02 / PETELOT, Catheline
2 route de Marbaix
59550 Taisnieres en Thierache / FR
03 / PETELOT, Emilie
2 route de Marbaix
59550 Taisnieres en Thierache / FR
04 / PETELOT, Adeline
2 route de Marbaix
59550 Taisnieres en Thierache / FR
05 / LEPINGLE, Viviane
14 rue des Saules
62112 Corbehem / FR
06 / LOUIS, Ghislain
1 Chemin du Vaillant
59230 Chateau L'Abbaye / FR
Representative(s)de Kernier, Gabriel
Cabinet Netter Conseils en Propriété Industrielle 36, avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]de Kernier, Gabriel
Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date07788846.907.06.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007FR00941
Priority number, dateFR2006000513309.06.2006         Original published format: FR 0605133
[2009/09]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007141427
Date:13.12.2007
Language:FR
[2007/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2027300
Date:25.02.2009
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2027300
Date:17.08.2011
Language:FR
[2011/33]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2027300
Date:14.11.2012
[2012/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.07.2008
ClassificationInternational:C22C38/22
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HR18.11.2008
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:STAHLZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR SPEZIELLE ANWENDUNGEN[2009/09]
English:STEEL COMPOSITIONS FOR SPECIAL USES[2009/09]
French:COMPOSITIONS D'ACIERS POUR USAGES SPECIAUX[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase18.11.2008National basic fee paid 
18.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
12.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.02.2011Fee for grant paid
16.02.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.08.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.05.2012  24.05.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
Opponent's representative
Jackson, Martin Peter
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2013/52]
Opponent(s)01  16.05.2012  24.05.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
Opponent's representative
Jackson, Martin Peter
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
GB-London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2013/42]
Opponent(s)01  16.05.2012  24.05.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Sumitomo Metal Industries, Ltd.
5-33, Kitahama, 4-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0041 / JP
Opponent's representative
Jackson, Martin Peter
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
GB-London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2013/06]
Opponent(s)01  16.05.2012  24.05.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
Opponent's representative
Jackson, Martin Peter
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
GB-London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2012/25]
Opponent(s)01  16.05.2012   
SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0041 / JP
Opponent's representative
Jackson, Martin Peter
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
GB-London WC1R 5JJ / GB
22.06.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.12.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
01.09.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.10.2016
17.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
21.12.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
31.12.2016Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
22.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.06.2007
CY17.08.2011
DK17.08.2011
EE17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IE17.08.2011
LT17.08.2011
LV17.08.2011
MT17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SI17.08.2011
SK17.08.2011
TR17.08.2011
BG17.11.2011
GR18.11.2011
IS17.12.2011
PT19.12.2011
LU07.06.2012
BE30.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]CY17.08.2011
DK17.08.2011
EE17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IE17.08.2011
LT17.08.2011
LV17.08.2011
MT17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SI17.08.2011
SK17.08.2011
TR17.08.2011
BG17.11.2011
GR18.11.2011
IS17.12.2011
PT19.12.2011
LU07.06.2012
BE30.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2014/21]CY17.08.2011
DK17.08.2011
EE17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IE17.08.2011
LT17.08.2011
LV17.08.2011
MT17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SI17.08.2011
SK17.08.2011
TR17.08.2011
BG17.11.2011
GR18.11.2011
IS17.12.2011
PT19.12.2011
BE30.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2013/35]CY17.08.2011
DK17.08.2011
EE17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IE17.08.2011
LT17.08.2011
LV17.08.2011
MT17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SI17.08.2011
SK17.08.2011
BG17.11.2011
GR18.11.2011
IS17.12.2011
PT19.12.2011
BE30.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2013/29]CY17.08.2011
DK17.08.2011
EE17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IE17.08.2011
LT17.08.2011
LV17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SI17.08.2011
SK17.08.2011
BG17.11.2011
GR18.11.2011
IS17.12.2011
PT19.12.2011
BE30.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2012/23]CY17.08.2011
EE17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IE17.08.2011
LT17.08.2011
LV17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SI17.08.2011
SK17.08.2011
GR18.11.2011
IS17.12.2011
PT19.12.2011
Former [2012/20]CY17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IE17.08.2011
LT17.08.2011
LV17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SI17.08.2011
GR18.11.2011
IS17.12.2011
PT19.12.2011
Former [2012/12]CY17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
LT17.08.2011
LV17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SI17.08.2011
GR18.11.2011
IS17.12.2011
PT19.12.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1081244  (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0787813  (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9,21,22 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0816523  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,8,9 * abstract *;
 [X]JPH02217483  (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1-4,8,9 * abstract *;
 [XA]US5573605  (BENDICK WALTER [DE], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 3; table .. * [A] 11,12;
 [A]EP1143026  (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0870573  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4,8,9 * abstract *
 [X]  - VAILLANT J C ET AL, "T/P23,24, 911 and 92: New grades for advanced coal-fired power plants Properties and experience", DATABASE COMPENDEX, ENGINEERING INFORMATION, INC., NEW YORK, NY, US, Database accession no. E20064110158431, XP002416389 [X] 1-4,8,9,13,15,16,18,20-22 * abstract *
 [X]  - PROC. CREEP CONF. FRACTURE HIGH TEMP. COMPONENTS DES. LIFE ASSESMENT ISS.; PROCEEDINGS - ECCC CREEP CONFERENCE: CREEP AND FRACTURE IN HIGH TEMPERATURE COMPONENTS - DESIGN AND LIFE ASSESSMENT ISSUES; PROCEEDINGS - ECCC CREEP CONFERENCE: CREEP AND FRAC, (2005), vol. 2005, pages 87 - 98, XP009077512 [X] 1-4,8,9,11,13,15,16,18,20-22
 [PX]  - BENDICK ET AL, "New low alloy heat resistant ferritic steels T/P23 and T/P24 for power plant application", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PRESSURE VESSELS AND PIPING, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING,, GB, (20070120), vol. 84, no. 1-2, ISSN 0308-0161, pages 13 - 20, XP005855062 [PX] 1-4,8,9,13 * figure 1; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijpvp.2006.09.002
 [X]  - BENDICK W ET AL, "NEUE WERKSTOFFENTWICKLUNGEN FUER MODERNE HOCHLEISTUNGSKRAFTWERKE NEW MATERIAL DEVELOPMENTS FOR MODERN HIGH-CAPACITY POWER PLANTS", VGB POWERTECH, VGB POWERTECH, ESSEN, DE, (2004), vol. 84, no. 7, ISSN 1435-3199, pages 82 - 88, XP001200573 [X] 1-4,8,9,13 * table 5 *
 [DX]  - LEPINGLE V. ET AL., "Steam Corrosion Resistance of New 12% Cr Ferritic Boiler Steels", MATERIALS SCIENCE FORUM, Switzerland, (2004), vol. 461-464, pages 1039 - 1046, XP002468481 [DX] 1-4,15,16 * the whole document *
 [X]  - BROZDA J, "NEW GENERATION CREEP-RESISTANT STEELS, THEIR WELDABILITY AND PROPERTIES OF WELDED JOINTS: T/P92 STEEL", WELDING INTERNATIONAL, WOODHEAD PUBLISHING LIMITED, CAMBRIDGESHIRE, GB, (2005), vol. 19, no. 1, ISSN 0950-7116, pages 5 - 13, XP001239864 [X] 1-4,15,18,20-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1533/wint.2005.3370
 [X]  - BROZDA J ET AL, "AN INVESTIGATION INTO THE PROPERTIES OF THE HEAT AFFECTED ZONE SIMULATED IN 9CR-1MO-NB, V(P91) STEEL INTENDED FOR SERVICE AT ELEVATED TEMPERATURES", WELDING INTERNATIONAL, WOODHEAD PUBLISHING LIMITED, CAMBRIDGESHIRE, GB, (199501), vol. 9, no. 12, ISSN 0950-7116, pages 929 - 940, XP000538256 [X] 1-4,15,16 * the whole document *