Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026796

EP2026796 - USE OF A VASOPEPTIDASE INHIBITOR FOR THE TREATMENT OF PULMONARY ARTERIAL HYPERTENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.09.2017No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.10.2017  [2017/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BIOPROJET
30, rue des Francs-Bourgeois
75003 Paris / FR
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHWARTZ, Jean-Charles
9 villa Seurat
75014 Paris / FR
02 / LECOMTE, Jeanne-Marie
30 rue des Francs Bourgeois
75003 Paris / FR
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[2016/45]
Former [2009/09]Jacobson, Claude
Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date07788875.812.06.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007FR00970
Priority number, dateFR2006000525013.06.2006         Original published format: FR 0605250
[2009/09]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007144501
Date:21.12.2007
Language:FR
[2007/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2026796
Date:25.02.2009
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2026796
Date:09.11.2016
Language:FR
[2016/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/36, A61K31/519, A61K45/06, A61P9/12
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/45]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesAL01.12.2008
BA01.12.2008
HR01.12.2008
MK01.12.2008
RS01.12.2008
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG EINES VASOPEPTIDASE-HEMMERS ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON LUNGEN-ARTERIEN-HOCHDRUCK[2009/09]
English:USE OF A VASOPEPTIDASE INHIBITOR FOR THE TREATMENT OF PULMONARY ARTERIAL HYPERTENSION[2009/09]
French:UTILISATION D'UN INHIBITEUR DE VASOPEPTIDASE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'HYPERTENSION ARTERIELLE PULMONAIRE[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase01.12.2008National basic fee paid 
01.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
31.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
20.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.09.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
22.09.2016Fee for grant paid
22.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.10.2016Information about intention to grant a patent
04.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.03.2009
Opposition(s)10.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
22.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
22.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
21.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
24.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
22.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
30.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[X]US2004220186  (BELL ANDREW SIMON [GB], et al) [X] 1-2,5-6,9,11 * paragraphs [0014] , [0085] , [0091] , [0100] *;
 [X]WO2005102317  (CELGENE CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,9,11 * claims 20,22 * * page 7, lines 7-11 * * page 51, lines 2-9,21,22 *;
 [PX]WO2006126082  (PHARMACIA & UPJOHN CO LLC [US], et al) [PX] 1-2,5-6,9,11 * paragraphs [0011] , [0051] , [0233] , [0234] , [0244] , [0247] , [0275] , [0276] *
 [A]  The Merck Index, 13th Edition, WHITEHOUSE STATION, NJ, USA, MERCK & CO., INC., XP002415987 [A] 1-11 * pages THER-30, column R, paragraph 2 *
 [X]  BIN YAP LOK ET AL, "Natriuretic peptides, respiratory disease, and the right heart", CHEST, (200410), vol. 126, no. 4, ISSN 0012-3692, pages 1330 - 1336, XP002415985 [X] 1,5,7,11 * page 1334, column L, paragraphs 4,5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1378/chest.126.4.1330