Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021641

EP2021641 - BALL BEARING CAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.2011
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 13.11.2013  [2013/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aktiebolaget SKF
Hornsgatan 1
415 50 Göteborg / SE
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / DOYER, Armel, Louis
3, passage de la Vieille Boissiere
37510 Savonnieres / FR
02 / BERENS, Frank
rue de Grenet
37110 Saunay / FR
03 / ADANE, Thierry
33, rue Pinguet Guindon
37100 Tours Nord / FR
04 / BAILLIEUL, Nicolas
7, rue du Général Jouan
50100 Cherbourg / FR
05 / MANCEAU, Alexandre
51, rue Fleurie
37540 St Cyr Sur Loire / FR
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Dossmann, Gérard
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstrasse 71-73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/23]Dossmann, Gérard
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71/73
80335 München / DE
Former [2009/07]Dossmann, Gérard
Bureau Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date07788939.212.04.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007FR51101
Priority number, dateFR2006000423212.05.2006         Original published format: FR 0604232
[2009/07]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007135305
Date:29.11.2007
Language:FR
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2021641
Date:11.02.2009
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2021641
Date:09.06.2010
Language:FR
[2010/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:F16C33/41
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KUGELLAGERKÄFIG[2009/07]
English:BALL BEARING CAGE[2009/07]
French:CAGE POUR ROULEMENT A BILLES[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase07.10.2008National basic fee paid 
07.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
07.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
10.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.01.2010Fee for grant paid
13.01.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.03.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.06.2010
CY09.06.2010
CZ09.06.2010
DK09.06.2010
EE09.06.2010
FI09.06.2010
HU09.06.2010
IE09.06.2010
LT09.06.2010
LV09.06.2010
MT09.06.2010
NL09.06.2010
PL09.06.2010
RO09.06.2010
SE09.06.2010
SI09.06.2010
SK09.06.2010
TR09.06.2010
BG09.09.2010
GR10.09.2010
ES20.09.2010
IS09.10.2010
PT11.10.2010
[2013/46]
Former [2013/45]AT09.06.2010
CY09.06.2010
CZ09.06.2010
DK09.06.2010
EE09.06.2010
FI09.06.2010
HU09.06.2010
IE09.06.2010
LT09.06.2010
LV09.06.2010
MT09.06.2010
NL09.06.2010
PL09.06.2010
RO09.06.2010
SE09.06.2010
SI09.06.2010
SK09.06.2010
TR09.06.2010
BG09.09.2010
GR10.09.2010
IS09.10.2010
PT11.10.2010
Former [2013/44]AT09.06.2010
CY09.06.2010
CZ09.06.2010
DK09.06.2010
EE09.06.2010
FI09.06.2010
IE09.06.2010
LT09.06.2010
LV09.06.2010
MT09.06.2010
NL09.06.2010
PL09.06.2010
RO09.06.2010
SE09.06.2010
SI09.06.2010
SK09.06.2010
TR09.06.2010
BG09.09.2010
GR10.09.2010
IS09.10.2010
PT11.10.2010
Former [2013/42]AT09.06.2010
CY09.06.2010
CZ09.06.2010
DK09.06.2010
EE09.06.2010
FI09.06.2010
IE09.06.2010
LT09.06.2010
LV09.06.2010
MT09.06.2010
NL09.06.2010
PL09.06.2010
RO09.06.2010
SE09.06.2010
SI09.06.2010
SK09.06.2010
BG09.09.2010
GR10.09.2010
IS09.10.2010
PT11.10.2010
Former [2012/05]AT09.06.2010
CY09.06.2010
CZ09.06.2010
DK09.06.2010
EE09.06.2010
FI09.06.2010
IE09.06.2010
LT09.06.2010
LV09.06.2010
MT09.06.2010
NL09.06.2010
PL09.06.2010
RO09.06.2010
SE09.06.2010
SI09.06.2010
SK09.06.2010
GR10.09.2010
IS09.10.2010
PT11.10.2010
Former [2011/25]AT09.06.2010
CY09.06.2010
CZ09.06.2010
DK09.06.2010
EE09.06.2010
FI09.06.2010
IE09.06.2010
LT09.06.2010
LV09.06.2010
NL09.06.2010
PL09.06.2010
RO09.06.2010
SE09.06.2010
SI09.06.2010
SK09.06.2010
GR10.09.2010
IS09.10.2010
PT11.10.2010
Cited inInternational search[XY]JP2003329045  (NSK LTD) [X] 1-3,10 * figures 1-3 * [Y] 4-9;
 [X]DE3724046  (KREJCI CAMILLO [AT]) [X] 1,2,10 * column 4, line 11 - line 33; figures 1-10 *;
 [Y]JPH11210757  (KOYO SEIKO CO) [Y] 4-8 * figures 1,6-9 *;
 [Y]EP1070866  (SKF FRANCE [FR]) [Y] 9 * paragraphs [0002] , [0051]; figure 7 *;
 [A]JP2002139049  (NSK LTD) [A] 1,5 * figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US5015105  (UENO HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1,9 * column 1, line 13 - line 33 *;
 [DA]JP2002147463  (NSK LTD)
by applicantJP2002147463