Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2054241

EP2054241 - PHOTONIC CRYSTAL SECURITY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.01.2010
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
05.04.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
De La Rue International Limited
De La Rue House, Jays Close, Viables
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB
[2009/19]
Inventor(s)01 / WHITEMAN, Robert
144 Hemdean Road Caversham, Reading
Bershire RG4 7ST / GB
 [2009/19]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/19]Lord, Michael
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date07789183.610.08.2007
[2009/19]
WO2007GB03057
Priority number, dateGB2006001592110.08.2006         Original published format: GB 0615921
[2009/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008017864
Date:14.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2054241
Date:06.05.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2008
[2009/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2054241
Date:03.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:B42D15/10, B42D15/00
[2009/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/19]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PHOTONENKRISTALLSICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNG[2009/19]
English:PHOTONIC CRYSTAL SECURITY DEVICE[2009/19]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SÉCURITÉ À CRISTAL PHOTONIQUE[2009/19]
Entry into regional phase10.03.2009National basic fee paid 
10.03.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
10.03.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/19]
23.04.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.09.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.01.2010Fee for grant paid
13.01.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.11.2010  04.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstr. 91
10969 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB
Potsdamer Platz 10
10785 Berlin / DE
 02  02.12.2010  04.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
CCL Secure Pty Ltd
Potter Street
Craigieburn VIC 3064 / AU
Opponent's representative
Walker, Stephen
Lincoln IP
9 Victoria Street
Aberdeen AB10 1XB / GB
 03  03.12.2010  04.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
PPG Industries Ohio, Inc.
3800 West 143rd Street
Cleveland, OH 44111 / US
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 [2017/52]
Former [2017/34]
Opponent(s)01  26.11.2010  04.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstr. 91
10969 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB
Potsdamer Platz 10
10785 Berlin / DE
 02  02.12.2010  04.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Innovia Security Pty Ltd.
Potter Street
Craigieburn VIC 3064 / AU
Opponent's representative
Walker, Stephen
Lincoln IP
9 Victoria Street
Aberdeen AB10 1XB / GB
 03  03.12.2010  04.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
PPG Industries Ohio, Inc.
3800 West 143rd Street
Cleveland, OH 44111 / US
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2015/14]
Opponent(s)01  26.11.2010  04.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstr. 91
10969 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB
Potsdamer Platz 10
10785 Berlin / DE
 02  02.12.2010  04.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Innovia Security Pty Ltd.
Potter Street
Craigieburn VIC 3064 / AU
Opponent's representative
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
 03  03.12.2010  04.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
PPG Industries Ohio, Inc.
3800 West 143rd Street
Cleveland, OH 44111 / US
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2013/46]
Opponent(s)01  26.11.2010  04.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstr. 91
10969 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner
Potsdamer Platz 10
10785 Berlin / DE
 02  02.12.2010  04.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Innovia Security Pty Ltd.
Potter Street
Craigieburn VIC 3064 / AU
Opponent's representative
Sherrard-Smith, Hugh
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
 03  03.12.2010  04.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
PPG Industries Ohio, Inc.
3800 West 143rd Street
Cleveland, OH 44111 / US
Opponent's representative
polypatent BGL
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2013/22]
Opponent(s)01  26.11.2010  04.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstr. 91
10969 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner
Potsdamer Platz 10
10785 Berlin / DE
 02  02.12.2010  04.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Securency International Pty Ltd
Potter Street
Craigieburn, VIC 3064 / AU
Opponent's representative
Sherrard-Smith, Hugh
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
 03  03.12.2010  04.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
PPG Industries Ohio, Inc.
3800 West 143rd Street
Cleveland, OH 44111 / US
Opponent's representative
polypatent BGL
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2011/03]
Opponent(s)01  26.11.2010   
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstr. 91
10969 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner
Potsdamer Platz 10
10785 Berlin / DE
 02  02.12.2010   
Securency International Pty Ltd
Potter Street
Craigieburn, VIC 3064 / AU
Opponent's representative
Sherrard-Smith, Hugh
Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road
Halifax Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB
 03  03.12.2010   
PPG Industries Ohio, Inc.
3800 West 143rd Street
Cleveland, OH 44111 / US
Opponent's representative
Polypatent
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2011/02]
Opponent(s)01  26.11.2010   
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstr. 91
10969 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner
Potsdamer Platz 10
10785 Berlin / DE
 02  02.12.2010   
Securency International Pty Ltd
Potter Street
Craigieburn, VIC 3064 / AU
Opponent's representative
Sherrard-Smith, Hugh
Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road
Halifax Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB
Former [2011/01]
Opponent(s)01  26.11.2010   
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstr. 91
10969 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner
Potsdamer Platz 10
10785 Berlin / DE
11.01.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.07.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
12.06.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.06.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition12.08.2015Appeal received No.  T1615/15
22.10.2015Statement of grounds filed
04.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
LT03.03.2010
LV03.03.2010
MT03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
TR03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
IS03.07.2010
PT05.07.2010
IE10.08.2010
LU10.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
HU04.09.2010
CZ10.08.2017
SK10.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
NL01.09.2017
[2018/39]
Former [2018/34]CY03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
LT03.03.2010
LV03.03.2010
MT03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
TR03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
IS03.07.2010
PT05.07.2010
IE10.08.2010
LU10.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
HU04.09.2010
CZ10.08.2017
SK10.08.2017
NL01.09.2017
Former [2018/25]CY03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
LT03.03.2010
LV03.03.2010
MT03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
TR03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
IS03.07.2010
PT05.07.2010
IE10.08.2010
LU10.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
HU04.09.2010
CZ10.08.2017
SK10.08.2017
Former [2018/21]CY03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
LT03.03.2010
LV03.03.2010
MT03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
TR03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
IS03.07.2010
PT05.07.2010
IE10.08.2010
LU10.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
HU04.09.2010
CZ10.08.2017
Former [2015/22]CY03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
LT03.03.2010
LV03.03.2010
MT03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
TR03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
IS03.07.2010
PT05.07.2010
IE10.08.2010
LU10.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
HU04.09.2010
Former [2012/03]CY03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
LT03.03.2010
LV03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
IS03.07.2010
PT05.07.2010
IE10.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
Former [2011/34]CY03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
LT03.03.2010
LV03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
IS03.07.2010
PT05.07.2010
IE10.08.2010
IT10.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
Former [2011/26]CY03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
LT03.03.2010
LV03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
IS03.07.2010
PT05.07.2010
IT10.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
Former [2011/25]CY03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
LT03.03.2010
LV03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
IS03.07.2010
PT05.07.2010
MC31.08.2010
Former [2010/43]FI03.03.2010
LT03.03.2010
LV03.03.2010
Cited inInternational search[A]US2003179364  (STEENBLIK RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 1-61 * paragraphs [0003] , [0008] , [0058] , [0079] , [0172] , [0173] *;
 [A]WO2006018094  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-61 * page 1, line 1 - line 17 * * page 15, line 25 - page 16, line 13 * * page 18, line 22 - line 31 * * page 21, line 1 - line 8 * * claims 1,21,22,33,35 *;
 [AD]WO03062900  (NANOVENTIONS INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-61 * page 5, line 27 - line 29 * * page 7, line 17 - line 21 * * page 26, line 13 - line 22 * * page 28, line 12 - line 29 * * figures 20,21 *