Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027252

EP2027252 - APPARATUS, SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR IN SITU MEASUREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip03.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.04.2017  [2017/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer Corporation
100 Bayer Road
Pittsburgh PA 15205 / US
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / JOERIS, Klaus, Michael
2325 Blake Street, 201
Berkeley, CA 94704 / US
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)BIP Patents
c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10
40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/34]BIP Patents
c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Creative Campus Monheim
Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10
40789 Monheim / DE
Former [2009/09]Linhart, Angela
Bayer HealthCare AG Law and Patents, Patents and Licensing Building Q18
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Application number, filing date07794362.923.04.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007US09883
Priority number, dateUS20060794269P21.04.2006         Original published format: US 794269 P
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007124159
Date:01.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/44]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2027252
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.10.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:G01N29/00, G01N11/00, G01N21/00, G01N1/20, C12M1/34
[2012/40]
Former International [2009/21]G01N29/00, G01N11/00, G01N21/00
Former International [2009/09]C12M3/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR VORORTMESSUNGEN[2009/09]
English:APPARATUS, SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR IN SITU MEASUREMENTS[2009/09]
French:APPAREIL, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURES IN SITU[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase21.11.2008National basic fee paid 
21.11.2008Search fee paid 
09.04.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
09.04.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.04.2009Examination requested  [2009/22]
11.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/14]
29.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/14]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
11.07.2013Request for further processing filed
11.07.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.07.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
03.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
12.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
30.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
10.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201610   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2005223829  (MAYEAUX DONALD P [US]) [X] 1-4,7-13,16-29 * paragraphs [0001] , [0016] , [0027] * * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]DE20316936U  (SARTORIUS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-13,16-29 * the whole document *;
 [X]US6809862  (BEHNSEN WILHELM [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,7-13,16-29 * columns 2-3 * * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]US6397689  (MOLES DONALD R [US]) [X] 1-4,7-13,16-29 * columns 1-3,6 * * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]US2004259241  (BARRINGER GEORGE E [US]) [X] 1-4,7-13,16-29 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0015] * * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US5553484  (BENDER WILLIAM J H [US], et al) [A] 1,12,16,19,24,26 * column 3 * * figure -; claim - *
International search[A]US2004022691  (ALLEN SUSAN D [US], et al);
 [A]US6872312  (SHAH JITENDRA T [US], et al);
 [A]US5663051  (VLASSELAER PETER VAN [US]);
 [A]US5635387  (FEI RUI G [US], et al);
 [A]US2003153059  (PILKINGTON PHYLLIS HEATHER [CA], et al);
 [A]US6860919  (NORTON ALAN [ZA], et al);
 [X]US5553484  (BENDER WILLIAM J H [US], et al);
 [X]US6397689  (MOLES DONALD R [US]);
 [A]US5442968  (WESTLAKE III THEODORE N [US], et al)