blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2023813 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2023813



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 148
25.09.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
05.07.2017 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
19.06.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
09.01.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
09.01.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.01.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
06.10.2016 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.09.2016 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
03.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.09.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
03.09.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
03.09.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
03.09.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.03.2013 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
12.02.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.02.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 7
12.02.2013 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 5
17.01.2011 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
21.01.2009 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
09.01.2009 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
22.12.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
22.12.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
22.12.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
15.12.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
15.12.2008 Fax request to enter the European phase Search / examination 7
15.12.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
15.12.2008 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
03.12.2008 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
26.09.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
17.01.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
17.01.2008 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
13.12.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 40
22.11.2007 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 32