blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2023813


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
29.09.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
06.07.2017 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
18.06.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
17.01.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.01.2017 First examination report
31.05.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.05.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.04.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.09.2013 Amendment by applicant
05.06.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.02.2013 Supplementary search report published on  13.03.2013  [2013/11]
01.02.2013 Change - classification published on  06.03.2013  [2013/10]
01.02.2013 Change - classification published on  06.03.2013  [2013/10]
04.05.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.05.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.04.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.07.2009 Change - extension states published on  19.08.2009  [2009/34]
21.04.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.01.2009 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.02.2009  [2009/08]
16.01.2009 Request for examination filed published on  18.02.2009  [2009/08]
10.01.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
22.12.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
16.12.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
16.12.2008 Amendment by applicant
13.02.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
19.01.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
27.11.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
28.09.2007 PCT data prior to European publication