blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2023813
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2007281034Global Dossier 06.12.2007A1
Priority number Date
US80390207 15.05.2007
US80038006 15.05.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5282031BGlobal Dossier 04.09.2013B2
JP2009537537 29.10.2009A
Priority number Date
WO2007US11719 15.05.2007
US80038006 15.05.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2023813Global Dossier 13.03.2013A4
EP2023813 18.02.2009A2
Priority number Date
WO2007US11719 15.05.2007
US80038006 15.05.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2007133801Global Dossier 17.01.2008A3
WO2007133801 22.11.2007A2
Priority number Date
US80038006 15.05.2006