Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023813

EP2023813 - MAGNETIC MICROPARTICLES COMPRISING ORGANIC SUBSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.11.2017  [2017/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kirpotin, Dmitri B
382 Ocean Avenue, Nr. 1509
Revere, MA 02151 / US
For all designated states
Chan, Daniel C.F.
3691 South Quebec Street
Denver, CO 80237 / US
For all designated states
Bunn, Paul, A., Jr.
630 Sundown Lane
Evergreen, CO 80439 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Kirpotin, Dmitri B
435 43rd Avenue, Apt. 102
San Francisco, CA 94121 / US
For all designated states
Chan, Daniel C.F.
3691 South Quebec Street
Denver, CO 80237 / US
For all designated states
Bunn, Paul, A., Jr.
630 Sundown Lane
Evergreen, CO 80439 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Tollett, Ian , et al
Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings
London, WC1V 7QH / GB
[2009/08]
Application number, filing date07794928.715.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007US11719
Priority number, dateUS20060800380P15.05.2006         Original published format: US 800380 P
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007133801
Date:22.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2023813
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US17.01.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/055, A61K49/18, A61K47/48, A61P35/00, A61P31/00
[2013/10]
Former International [2009/08]A61B5/055
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MAGNETISCHE MIKROPARTIKEL MIT ORGANISCHEN STOFFEN[2009/08]
English:MAGNETIC MICROPARTICLES COMPRISING ORGANIC SUBSTANCES[2009/08]
French:MICROPARTICULES MAGNÉTIQUES COMPRENANT DES SUBSTANCES ORGANIQUES[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase15.12.2008National basic fee paid 
15.12.2008Search fee paid 
15.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
15.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
03.09.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/44]
19.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/44]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.01.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
19.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
05.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
29.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
24.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
26.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
25.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201711   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAI]WO0243708  (ALEXIOU C) [X] 1-5,7,10-15 * page 11, lines 17-27; claims 1-3, 5-7, 8-11, 15, 18-20 * * page 12, line 17 - page 13, line 11 * * page 8, line 16 - page 9, line 6 * * page 13, line 13 - page 14, line 5 * * page 14, lines 28-33 * * page 5, lines 20-25 * * page 8, lines 5-7 * [A] 8,9 [I] 6;
 [XYI]WO03101494  (DNA RES INNOVATIONS LTD) [X] 1-5,8,10-15 * page 10, line 9 - page 12, line 9; figures 2-3, 12; claims 1-3, 10-12, 14-17, 22-26, 30-33,35-37, 41, 42, 45, * * page 15, lines 1-11 * * page 16, lines 12-14 * * page 16, line 32 - page 17, line 4; examples 3, 6-11 * * page 18, lines 14-17 * * page 21, lines 1-5 * * page 26, lines 14-17 * * page 30, lines 1-31 * * page 22, lines 17-29 * * page 21, lines 15-23 * * pages 24-25 * * page 26, lines 1-5 * * page 6, lines 25-29 * * page 28, lines 26-31 * [Y] 1-3,5-15 [I] 6,7,9;
 [XI]EP0361960  (RANNEY DAVID F) [X] 1,2,4-6,9-15 * page 10, lines 16-25; example 10; claims 1, 5, 7, 8, 13 * * page 9, lines 9-12 * * page 11, lines 9-24 * * page 10, lines 43-55 * * page 25, line 58 - page 26, line 3 * * page 16, lines 14-17 * [I] 7;
 [XI]US2003054027  (UNGER EVAN C) [X] 1-5,8,15 * column 3, lines 56-67, paragraphs 190-1, 388; claims 1, 2, 12, 13 * [I] 6;
 [XD]US5411730  (KIRPOTIN D ET AL) [XD] 1-15 * column 18, line 43 - column 20, line 60; examples 1, 3; claims 1, 2, 9-10, 12; tables 1, 9 * * column 5, lines 59-66 * * column 6, lines 2-30 * * column 4, lines 55-64 *;
 [Y]US2003129223  (WARTCHOW C A ET AL) [Y] 1-3,5,8,9,15 * pages 14-15, paragraphs 132-142; claims 1, 4, 8, 11-19, 21-24 * * paragraphs [0154] - [0159]; figures 1G, 1I; claims 25-33 * * paragraph [0223]; examples 4, 7 * * paragraphs [0161] - [0162] *;
 [Y]WO0182899  (MBT MUNICH BIOTECHNOLOGY GMBH) [Y] 1,5-7,9-15 * page 13, lines 26-28; examples 1-3, 5, 9 *;
 [A]US2006002852  (SALTZMAN W M ET AL) [A] 8,9 * paragraph [0058]; figure 1b *
 [X]  - SHI K ET AL, "[Magnetic drug delivery system--adriamycin-carboxymethyl dextran magnetic nanoparticles].", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (200003), Database accession no. NLM10879185, XP002691193 [X] 1,3-8,10,15 * abstract *
International search[X]US2003054027  ;
 [Y]US2006002852  ;
 [Y]US2004142102