Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027563

EP2027563 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR MANAGING RETENTION OF INFORMATION ASSETS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.05.2015
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.05.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.06.2015  [2015/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Iron Mountain Incorporated
745 Atlantic Avenue
Boston, MA 02111 / US
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / BENTLEY, Mark, R.
5 Musket Drive
Acton, MA 01720 / US
02 / LABRIE, Maurice, L.
7 Silver Street
Milton, NH 03851 / US
03 / REESE, C., Richard
The Belvedere Residence 100 Belvedere Street, No. 9f
Boston, MA 02199 / US
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Kazi, Ilya , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Kazi, Ilya , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
Application number, filing date07795148.122.05.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007US12126
Priority number, dateUS20060802347P22.05.2006         Original published format: US 802347 P
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007139762
Date:06.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2027563
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F12/00
[2009/13]
Former International [2009/09]G06Q10/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR VERWALTUNG DER RETENTION VON INFORMATIONS-ASSETS[2009/09]
English:METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR MANAGING RETENTION OF INFORMATION ASSETS[2009/09]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR GÉRER LA CONSERVATION D'ACTIFS INFORMATIONNELS[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase19.12.2008National basic fee paid 
22.12.2008Search fee paid 
19.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/13]
02.12.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/25]
20.01.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2015/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201408   M06   Not yet paid