Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2019989

EP2019989 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DISTRIBUTING SYSTEM TESTS IN PARALLEL COMPUTING ENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.03.2016
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.04.2016  [2016/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The MathWorks, Inc.
3 Apple Hill Drive
Natick, MA 01760 / US
[2016/11]
Former [2009/06]For all designated states
The Mathworks, Inc.
3 Apple Hill Drive
Natick, MA 01760 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DEAN, Loren
9 Emerson Street
Natick, MA 01760 / US
02 / THOMAS, Michael, J.
19 Kingsbury Street
Framingham, MA 01702 / US
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)Rupprecht, Kay , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 47
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/06]Tomlinson, Edward James
Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date07795202.623.05.2007
[2009/06]
WO2007US12238
Priority number, dateUS2006043886623.05.2006         Original published format: US 438866
[2009/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007139803
Date:06.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2019989
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.04.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/50, G06F9/46, G06F11/00
[2009/20]
Former International [2009/06]G06F17/50
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/06]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM TESTEN VON VERTEILUNGSSYSTEMEN IN PARALLELEN COMPUTERUMGEBUNGEN[2009/06]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DISTRIBUTING SYSTEM TESTS IN PARALLEL COMPUTING ENVIRONMENTS[2009/06]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DISTRIBUTION DE TESTS DE SYSTÈME DANS DES ENVIRONNEMENTS INFORMATIQUES PARALLÈLES[2009/06]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2008National basic fee paid 
31.03.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.03.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.03.2008Examination requested  [2009/06]
23.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/16]
11.12.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/16]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.03.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
28.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[X]  - BERTRAND F ET AL, "Data Redistribution and Remote Method Invocation in Parallel Component Architectures", PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED PROCESSING SYMPOSIUM, 2005. PROCEEDINGS. 19TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL DENVER, CO, USA 04-08 APRIL 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050404), ISBN 0-7695-2312-9, pages 1 - 13, XP010785529 [X] 1-35 * abstract * * page 1, column L, paragraph 1 - page 2 * * page 3 - page 5 * * page 7, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 9, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 10, column L, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IPDPS.2005.159
 [X]  - BERTRAND F ET AL, "DCA: A distributed CCA framework based on MPI", HIGH-LEVEL PARALLEL PROGRAMMING MODELS AND SUPPORTIVE ENVIRONMENTS, 2004. PROCEEDINGS. NINTH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON SANTA FE, NM, USA 26 APRIL 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (2004), ISBN 0-7695-2151-7, pages 80 - 89, XP010705640 [X] 1-35 * abstract * * page 81, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 82, column L * * page 83, column L, paragraph 3 - column R, paragraph 1 * * page 84, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 86, column L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/HIPS.2004.1299193
 [A]  - BRYAN CARPENTER ET AL, "Applications of HPJava", LANGUAGES AND COMPILERS FOR PARALLEL COMPUTING LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS, SPRINGER-VERLAG, BE, (2004), vol. 2958, ISBN 3-540-21199-3, pages 147 - 161, XP019002950 [A] 1-35 * abstract * * page 147 - page 148 *