Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021003

EP2021003 - IMIDAZOAZEPHINONE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.05.2011
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eisai R&D Management Co., Ltd.
6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo 112-8088 / JP
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / SPYVEE, Mark
75 Laura Lane
Hampstead, New Hampshire 03841 / US
02 / SELETSKY, Boris
8 Delphi Circle
Andover, Massachusetts 01810 / US
03 / SCHILLER, Shawn
614 Hilldale Avenue
Haverhill, Massachusetts 01832 / US
04 / FANG, Francis
16 Greybirch Road
Andover, Massachusetts 01810 / US
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Horner, Martin Grenville , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow
G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Horner, Martin Grenville , et al
Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow
G1 3AE / GB
Application number, filing date07795237.224.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007US12298
Priority number, dateUS20060808770P26.05.2006         Original published format: US 808770 P
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007139833
Date:06.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2021003
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2021003
Date:21.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/435, A61K31/55, A61P37/00, A61P37/06, A61P17/06, A61P3/10, A61P9/10
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesAL21.11.2008
BA21.11.2008
HR21.11.2008
MK21.11.2008
RS21.11.2008
TitleGerman:IMIDAZOAZEPHINONVERBINDUNGEN[2009/07]
English:IMIDAZOAZEPHINONE COMPOUNDS[2009/07]
French:COMPOSÉS D'IMIDAZO-AZÉPHINONE[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase21.11.2008National basic fee paid 
21.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
21.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
25.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2010Fee for grant paid
03.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.04.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.07.2010
BE21.07.2010
CY21.07.2010
CZ21.07.2010
DK21.07.2010
EE21.07.2010
FI21.07.2010
HU21.07.2010
LT21.07.2010
LV21.07.2010
MT21.07.2010
PL21.07.2010
RO21.07.2010
SI21.07.2010
SK21.07.2010
TR21.07.2010
BG21.10.2010
GR22.10.2010
IS21.11.2010
PT22.11.2010
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT21.07.2010
BE21.07.2010
CY21.07.2010
CZ21.07.2010
DK21.07.2010
EE21.07.2010
FI21.07.2010
LT21.07.2010
LV21.07.2010
MT21.07.2010
PL21.07.2010
RO21.07.2010
SI21.07.2010
SK21.07.2010
TR21.07.2010
BG21.10.2010
GR22.10.2010
IS21.11.2010
PT22.11.2010
Former [2012/05]AT21.07.2010
BE21.07.2010
CY21.07.2010
CZ21.07.2010
DK21.07.2010
EE21.07.2010
FI21.07.2010
LT21.07.2010
LV21.07.2010
MT21.07.2010
PL21.07.2010
RO21.07.2010
SI21.07.2010
SK21.07.2010
BG21.10.2010
GR22.10.2010
IS21.11.2010
PT22.11.2010
Former [2011/26]AT21.07.2010
BE21.07.2010
CY21.07.2010
CZ21.07.2010
DK21.07.2010
EE21.07.2010
FI21.07.2010
LT21.07.2010
LV21.07.2010
PL21.07.2010
RO21.07.2010
SI21.07.2010
SK21.07.2010
BG21.10.2010
GR22.10.2010
IS21.11.2010
PT22.11.2010
Cited inInternational search[A]EP1619193  (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 37, paragraph 129; claim - *;
 [A]EP0385489  (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [PA]WO2006128143  (EISAI CO LTD [JP], et al) [PA] 1-12 * abstract * * page 21, paragraph 77 - page 22, paragraph 78 *