EP2021183 - Wireless printer system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/07] | WIRELESS SYSTEM-IN-PACKAGE AND IMAGE PROCESSING CONTROL APPARATUS | ||
[2010/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marvell World Trade Ltd. L'Horizon Gunsite Road Brittons Hill St. Michael 14027 / BB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states Marvell World Trade Ltd. L'Horizon, Gunsite Road Brittons Hills BB 14027 Saint Michael / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONTIERTH, Mark D. 7175 N. Springcrest Meridian, Idaho 83642 / US | 02 /
ZIMMERMAN, Gary D. 90 Blue Shadow Drive Garden Valley, ID 83622 / US | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07795293.5 | 24.05.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007US12402 | Priority number, date | US20060808634P | 26.05.2006 Original published format: US 808634 P | US20070751687 | 22.05.2007 Original published format: US 751687 | [2009/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007139893 | Date: | 06.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2021183 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2021183 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/36, H04N1/00, G06F3/12 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
B41J3/36 (EP,US);
G06F3/1292 (US);
G06F3/1204 (US);
G06F3/1293 (US);
H04N1/00103 (EP,US);
H04N1/00127 (EP,US);
H04N1/00315 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0055 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0082 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0086 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/25] |
Former [2009/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Drahtloses Drucksystem | [2010/08] | English: | Wireless printer system | [2010/08] | French: | Système d'impression sans fil | [2010/08] |
Former [2009/07] | DRAHTLOSES VERPACKTES SYSTEM UND BILDVERARBEITUNGS-STEUERVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2009/07] | WIRELESS SYSTEM-IN-PACKAGE AND IMAGE PROCESSING CONTROL APPARATUS | ||
Former [2009/07] | SYSTÈME EN BOÎTIER SANS FIL ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 04.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5524185 (NA KWEON [KR]) [A] 1-38 * column 4, lines 31-67 * * column 5, lines 1-43; figure 3 *; | [Y]US6379058 (PETTERUTI STEVEN F [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,13-18,22-24,35-38 * abstract * * column 3, line 47 - line 67 * * column 4, line 1 - line 11 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]WO03003197 (OAK TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [Y] 1,2,13-18,22-24,35-38 * abstract * * paragraphs [0036] , [0038] , [0039]; figure 1a *; | [A]US2005157329 (PARK DONG-IK [KR], et al) [A] 1-38 * abstract * * paragraphs [0029] - [0032] - [0036] , [0037]; figure 3 *; | [PA]US2007086035 (WHELESS THOMAS O JR [US], et al) [PA] 3-12,19-21,25-34 * abstract ** paragraphs [0019] , [0023] - [0025]; figures 4,6 * |