Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021438

EP2021438 - MICROREACTOR PROCESS FOR MAKING BIODIESEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.09.2011
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.09.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.10.2011  [2011/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STATE OF OREGON, Acting By And Through The State Board Of Higher Education On Behalf Of Oregon State University
312 Kerr Administration Building Oregon State University
Corvallis, Oregon 97331 / US
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / JOVANOVIC, Goran, Nadezda
1060 N.W. Heather Drive
Corvallis, OR 97330 / US
02 / PAUL, Brian, Kevin
Dept.of Industrial And Manufacturing Engineering 118 Covell
7-7320
Corvallis, OR 97331 / US
03 / PARKER, James
15509 N.E. 4th Street
Vancouver, Washington 98684 / US
04 / AL-DHUBABIAN, Ahmad
P.O. Box 9331
Jeddah, 21413 / SA
 [2009/37]
Former [2009/07]01 / JOVANOVIC, Goran, Nadezda
1060 N.W. Heather Drive
Corvallis, OR 97330 / US
02 / PAUL, Brian, Kevin
Dept.of Industrial And Manufacturing Engineering 118 Covell
7-7320
Corvallis, OR 97331 / US
03 / PARKER, James
323 Nw 8th St.
Corvallis, OR 97330 / US
04 / AL-DHUBABIAN, Ahmad
P.O. Box 9331
Jeddah, 21413 / SA
Representative(s)Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2008/44]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date07795499.830.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007US12763
Priority number, dateUS20060810569P01.06.2006         Original published format: US 810569 P
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007142983
Date:13.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2021438
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.01.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:C10L1/18, C10L1/02, C11C3/00, B01J19/00
[2010/37]
Former International [2009/07]C10L1/18
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MIKROREAKTORVERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BIODIESEL[2009/07]
English:MICROREACTOR PROCESS FOR MAKING BIODIESEL[2009/07]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE MICRORÉACTEUR POUR FABRIQUER DU BIODIÉSEL[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2008National basic fee paid 
31.03.2008Search fee paid 
31.03.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.03.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
01.04.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/42]
24.05.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201105   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE10043644  (GOES GES FUER FORSCHUNG UND TE [DE]) [X] 1-35 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0019]; figure -; example -; claim - *;
 [X]WO03076558  (DRACOWO FORSCHUNGS UND ENTWICK [DE], et al) [X] 1-35 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 9, paragraph 1; figure .; claim - *;
 [E]WO2007082103  (GURIN MICHAEL H [US]) [E] 1-35 * abstract * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0110]; claim - *
 [XI]  Gregg Kleiner, "Tiny microreactor for biodiesel production could aid farmers, nation", Internet Article, (20060220), Oregon State University, URL: http://oregonstate.edu/dept/ncs/newsarch/2006/Feb06/microreactors.htm, (20100730), XP002594832 [X] 1,2,6,9,17,18,20 * the whole document * [I] 3-5,7,8,10-16,19,21-35
International search[Y]US2005011112  (KHALIL CARLOS NAGIB [BR], et al);
 [Y]US5599358  (GIAVAZZI FULVIO [IT], et al);
 [Y]US4908162  (RUBIN DAVID [US]);
 [Y]US2005220681  (CHANG CHIH-HUNG [US], et al);
 [Y]US5648483  (GRANBERG ERIC PAUL [US], et al);
 [Y]US6887283  (GINOSAR DANIEL M [US], et al)
 [Y]  - XU Y. ET AL., "Conversion of Soybean Oil to Biodiesel Fuel Using Lipozyme TL IM in a Solvent-free Medium", BIOCATALYSIS AND BIOTRANSFORMATION, (200401), vol. 22, no. 1, XP008131276

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/10242420410001661222
 [Y]  - VERA ET AL., "Production of Biodiesel by a Two-Step Supercritical Reaction Process with Adsorption Refining", ENPROMER. 2ND MERCOSUR CONGRESS ON CHEMICAL ENGINEERING: 4TH MERCOSUR CONGRESS ON PROCESS SYSTEMS ENGINEERING, (2005), XP008131277
 [Y]  - ALLEN M. AND PRATEEPCHAIKUL G., "The Modelling of the Biodiesel Reaction", URL: http://www.journeytoforever.org/biofuel_library/macromodx.html, XP008131278