Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025177

EP2025177 - WIRELESS SUBSCRIBER STATION FOR SHORT RANGE AD-HOC DATA COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.01.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.11.2016
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Chun, Woo
3170 Hastings Way
San Ramon, CA 94582 / US
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/06]
Former [2009/08]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date07795544.130.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007US12840
Priority number, dateUS20060810330P02.06.2006         Original published format: US 810330 P
US2007080763829.05.2007         Original published format: US 807638
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007143032
Date:13.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2025177
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2025177
Date:08.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.02.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W84/02, H04B5/00, H04B7/00, H04W84/18
[2013/13]
Former International [2009/10]H04W84/02, H04B5/00, H04B7/00
Former International [2009/08]H04Q7/20, H04B5/00, H04B7/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/06]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSE TEILNEHMERSTATION ZUR AD-HOC-DATENKOMMUNIKATION MIT GERINGER REICHWEITE[2009/08]
English:WIRELESS SUBSCRIBER STATION FOR SHORT RANGE AD-HOC DATA COMMUNICATION[2009/08]
French:STATION D'ABONNÉS SANS FIL POUR COMMUNICATION DE DONNÉES AD-HOC DE COURTE PORTÉE[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase05.12.2008National basic fee paid 
05.12.2008Search fee paid 
05.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
07.08.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.11.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
14.11.2016Fee for grant paid
14.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.07.2016
Opposition(s)09.11.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
10.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
07.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.02.2017
CZ08.02.2017
DK08.02.2017
EE08.02.2017
LT08.02.2017
LV08.02.2017
MC08.02.2017
PL08.02.2017
RO08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
SI08.02.2017
SK08.02.2017
BG08.05.2017
GR09.05.2017
IE30.05.2017
LU30.05.2017
MT30.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
PT08.06.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/39]AT08.02.2017
CZ08.02.2017
DK08.02.2017
EE08.02.2017
LT08.02.2017
LV08.02.2017
MC08.02.2017
PL08.02.2017
RO08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
SI08.02.2017
SK08.02.2017
BG08.05.2017
GR09.05.2017
IE30.05.2017
LU30.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
PT08.06.2017
Former [2018/23]AT08.02.2017
CZ08.02.2017
DK08.02.2017
EE08.02.2017
LT08.02.2017
LV08.02.2017
MC08.02.2017
PL08.02.2017
RO08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
SI08.02.2017
SK08.02.2017
BG08.05.2017
GR09.05.2017
IE30.05.2017
LU30.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
PT08.06.2017
Former [2018/17]AT08.02.2017
CZ08.02.2017
DK08.02.2017
EE08.02.2017
LT08.02.2017
LV08.02.2017
MC08.02.2017
PL08.02.2017
RO08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
SI08.02.2017
SK08.02.2017
BG08.05.2017
GR09.05.2017
LU30.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
PT08.06.2017
Former [2018/13]AT08.02.2017
CZ08.02.2017
DK08.02.2017
EE08.02.2017
LT08.02.2017
LV08.02.2017
MC08.02.2017
PL08.02.2017
RO08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
SI08.02.2017
SK08.02.2017
BG08.05.2017
GR09.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT08.06.2017
Former [2018/06]AT08.02.2017
CZ08.02.2017
DK08.02.2017
EE08.02.2017
LT08.02.2017
LV08.02.2017
MC08.02.2017
PL08.02.2017
RO08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
SK08.02.2017
BG08.05.2017
GR09.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT08.06.2017
Former [2017/50]AT08.02.2017
CZ08.02.2017
DK08.02.2017
EE08.02.2017
LT08.02.2017
LV08.02.2017
PL08.02.2017
RO08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
SK08.02.2017
BG08.05.2017
GR09.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT08.06.2017
Former [2017/49]AT08.02.2017
CZ08.02.2017
EE08.02.2017
LT08.02.2017
LV08.02.2017
RO08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
SK08.02.2017
BG08.05.2017
GR09.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT08.06.2017
Former [2017/48]AT08.02.2017
CZ08.02.2017
LT08.02.2017
LV08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
BG08.05.2017
GR09.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT08.06.2017
Former [2017/41]AT08.02.2017
LT08.02.2017
LV08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
BG08.05.2017
GR09.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT08.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2005255878  (LEINONEN MARKO E [FI] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,8-10,12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0083] * * figures 7, 8 * [A] 3,5-7,11,13;
 [XA]US2005243758  (TORARP CARL-JOHAN Y [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,8-10,12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0065] * * figure 6 * [A] 3,5-7,11,13;
 [XA]US2005036470  (CALVERT NATHAN HUNTER [US]) [X] 1,2,4,8-10,12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] * [A] 3,5-7,11,13;
 [XA]WO0162026  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]; RANTA JUKKA [FI]; JOKINEN HARRI [FI]; LE) [X] 1,2,4,8-10,12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * [A] 3,5-7,11,13
International search[X]US2005255878  ;
 [A]US2004127214  ;
 [A]US2003083095  ;
 [A]US2004092265
 [Y]  - "Air Interface for Fixed Broadband Wireless Access Systems", 802.16 IEEE STANDARD FOR LOCAL AND METROPOLITAN AREA NETWORKS PART 16, page 48, 138, 462, XP008104573
by applicantUS2005255878