Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027398

EP2027398 - POWER TRANSMISSION BELT AND A PROCESS FOR ITS MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2010
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE GATES CORPORATION
1551 Wewatta
Denver, CO 80202 / US
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / DUKE, Joseph Raleigh, Jr.
505 Park Avenue
Elizabethtown, KY 42701 / US
02 / YU, Tao
771 Orchard Drive
Louisville, CO 80027 / US
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)James, Anthony Christopher W.P. , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London
WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]James, Anthony Christopher W.P. , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date07795661.301.06.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007US13052
Priority number, dateUS2006044600501.06.2006         Original published format: US 446005
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007143160
Date:13.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2027398
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2027398
Date:13.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:F16G1/28, F16G5/20, B29D29/08
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KRAFTÜBERTRAGUNGSBAND UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG[2009/09]
English:POWER TRANSMISSION BELT AND A PROCESS FOR ITS MANUFACTURE[2009/09]
French:COURROIE DE TRANSMISSION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE LADITE COURROIE[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase18.11.2008National basic fee paid 
18.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
28.05.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.09.2009Fee for grant paid
22.09.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.11.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
20.11.2009Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
14.12.2009Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted
Opposition(s)14.10.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.01.2010
BE13.01.2010
CY13.01.2010
CZ13.01.2010
DK13.01.2010
EE13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
IT13.01.2010
LT13.01.2010
LV13.01.2010
MT13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
PL13.01.2010
RO13.01.2010
SE13.01.2010
SI13.01.2010
SK13.01.2010
TR13.01.2010
BG13.04.2010
GR14.04.2010
ES24.04.2010
IS13.05.2010
PT13.05.2010
IE01.06.2010
LU01.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
HU14.07.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/43]AT13.01.2010
BE13.01.2010
CY13.01.2010
CZ13.01.2010
DK13.01.2010
EE13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
IT13.01.2010
LT13.01.2010
LV13.01.2010
MT13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
PL13.01.2010
RO13.01.2010
SE13.01.2010
SI13.01.2010
SK13.01.2010
BG13.04.2010
GR14.04.2010
ES24.04.2010
IS13.05.2010
PT13.05.2010
IE01.06.2010
LU01.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
HU14.07.2010
Former [2012/42]AT13.01.2010
BE13.01.2010
CY13.01.2010
CZ13.01.2010
DK13.01.2010
EE13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
IT13.01.2010
LT13.01.2010
LV13.01.2010
MT13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
PL13.01.2010
RO13.01.2010
SE13.01.2010
SI13.01.2010
SK13.01.2010
BG13.04.2010
GR14.04.2010
ES24.04.2010
IS13.05.2010
PT13.05.2010
IE01.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
HU14.07.2010
Former [2011/25]AT13.01.2010
BE13.01.2010
CY13.01.2010
CZ13.01.2010
DK13.01.2010
EE13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
IT13.01.2010
LT13.01.2010
LV13.01.2010
MT13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
PL13.01.2010
RO13.01.2010
SE13.01.2010
SI13.01.2010
SK13.01.2010
BG13.04.2010
GR14.04.2010
ES24.04.2010
IS13.05.2010
PT13.05.2010
IE01.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2010/43]AT13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
LT13.01.2010
LV13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
PL13.01.2010
SI13.01.2010
ES24.04.2010
IS13.05.2010
PT13.05.2010
Former [2010/33]AT13.01.2010
ES24.04.2010
Former [2010/30]AT13.01.2010
Cited inInternational search[A]GB2349113  (GATES CORP [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 2, line 15 - page 5, line 5; figure - *;
 [A]US3835720  (FISHER D, et al) [A] 1-15 * column A; figure - *;
 [A]WO0175330  (CONTITECH ANTRIEBSSYSTEME GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0596713  (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * page Q; figure - *;
 [A]EP0662571  (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *