Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025017

EP2025017 - PROCESS FOR MAKING CONTAINED LAYERS AND DEVICES MADE WITH SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.05.2015
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.05.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.06.2015  [2015/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
Former [2008/30]For all designated states
E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LECLOUX, Daniel, David
730 Westcliff Road
Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US
02 / SMITH, Eric, Maurice
359 Springhouse Lane
Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US
03 / JOHANSSON, Gary, A.
6 Kenwick Road
Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Hoffmann, Benjamin , et al
Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/36]Hoffmann, Benjamin , et al
Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2009/08]Towler, Philip Dean , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date07795782.705.06.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007US13286
Priority number, dateUS20060810939P05.06.2006         Original published format: US 810939 P
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007145978
Date:21.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2025017
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:H01L51/52
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/28]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG ABGEGRENZTER SCHICHTEN UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTE GERÄTE[2009/08]
English:PROCESS FOR MAKING CONTAINED LAYERS AND DEVICES MADE WITH SAME[2009/08]
French:PROCEDE POUR FABRIQUER DES COUCHES ENVELOPPEES ET DISPOSITIFS FABRIQUES PAR LEDIT PROCEDE[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase26.11.2008National basic fee paid 
26.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
06.01.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
17.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
18.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.01.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/23]
29.01.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2015/23]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.03.2009
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
13.01.2010Request for further processing filed
13.01.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.01.2010Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
10.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201408   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2003017360  (TAI ELIZABETH [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,8,9,13,15,16,18,19 * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] , [0015] - [0017] - [0030] - [0032] - [0048]; figures 1,5 * [Y] 10-12,14,17;
 [X]US2005026317  (SIRRINGHAUS HENNING [GB], et al) [X] 1-5,7 * paragraphs [0033] - [0036] - [0097] - [0101] - [0114]; figures 7a-c *;
 [X]US6992326  (MACPHERSON CHARLES DOUGLAS [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,8 * column 10, line 36 - column 11, line 55 * * column 8, line 56 - column 9, line 45; figure 23 *;
 [X]JPH09203803  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1,3 * abstract *;
 [Y]US6753380  (QIU ZAI-MING [US]) [Y] 10-12,14,17 * column 1, line 8 - line 18 * * column 5, line 64 - column 7, line 54 *
Examination EP1411088
  JP2005166645