Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027586

EP2027586 - ION BEAM APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ION IMPLANTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  28.03.2014
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2014Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 30.04.2014  [2014/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Semequip, Inc.
34 Sullivan Road, North Billerica
Massachusetts, 01862-2000 / US
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / GLAVISH, Hilton, F.
803 Tyner Way P.O. Box 4348
Incline Village, NV 89450 / US
02 / JACOBSON, Dale, Conrad
16 Flintlock Road
Salem, NH 03079 / US
03 / HORSKY, Thomas, N.
816 Depot Road
Boxborough, MA 01719 / US
04 / HAHTO, Sami, K.
17 Autumn Glenn Circle
Nashua, NH 03062 / US
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Paustian, Othmar
Boeters & Lieck
Patentanwälte
Oberanger 32
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Paustian, Othmar
BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date07796127.413.06.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007US13984
Priority number, dateUS20060813431P13.06.2006         Original published format: US 813431 P
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007146394
Date:21.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2027586
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US31.07.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:G21K5/10, H01J33/02
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:IONENSTRAHLGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR IONENIMPLANTATION[2009/09]
English:ION BEAM APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ION IMPLANTATION[2009/09]
French:APPAREIL A FAISCEAU IONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ D'IMPLANTATION IONIQUE[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2008National basic fee paid 
12.12.2008Search fee paid 
12.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
25.05.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2014Application withdrawn by applicant  [2014/18]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.01.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4800100  (HERBOTS NICOLE [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * column 6 * * column 9 - column 10 *;
 [Y]WO0243803  (SEMEQUIP INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 11 - page 13 *;
 [Y]EP1538655  (SEMEQUIP INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0130] *
International search[X]US5629528  (JOST JONATHAN A [US], et al);
 [Y]US2002003208  (DUDNIKOV VADIM G [US]);
 [X]US2005258380  (WHITE NICHOLAS R [US], et al);
 [Y]US2006097193  (HORSKY THOMAS N [US], et al);
 [A]US5311028  (GLAVISH HILTON F [US]);
 [A]US2002121613  (SCHEUER JAY T [US], et al);
 [A]US6130436  (RENAU ANTHONY [US], et al)