Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2043979

EP2043979 - TETRAFLUOROPROPENE PRODUCTION PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.04.2015
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2018New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
1007 Market Street
Wilmington DE 19801 / US
[2016/25]
Former [2009/15]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
Former [2008/30]For all designated states
E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NAPPA, Mario, Joseph
3 Oakridge Court
Newark, Delaware 19711 / US
02 / RAO, Velliyur, Nott, Mallikarjuna
1 Georgetown Avenue
Wilmington, Delaware 19809 / US
03 / SIEVERT, Allen, Capron
215 Rhett Lane
Elkton, Maryland 21921 / US
 [2009/15]
Representative(s)Heinemann, Monica , et al
Abitz & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Arabellastraße 17
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/18]Matthews, Derek Peter
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2009/15]Matthews, Derek Peter
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date07796388.222.06.2007
[2009/15]
WO2007US14645
Priority number, dateUS20060816650P27.06.2006         Original published format: US 816650 P
[2009/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008002500
Date:03.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2043979
Date:08.04.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2008
[2009/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2043979
Date:29.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:B01J37/26, B01J21/04, B01J27/125, C07C17/386, C07C21/18, C07C17/25
[2014/48]
Former International [2009/15]C07C17/25, C07C19/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/18]
Former [2009/15]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TETRAFLUORPROPEN[2009/15]
English:TETRAFLUOROPROPENE PRODUCTION PROCESSES[2009/15]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION DE TÉTRAFLUOROPROPÈNE[2009/15]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2009National basic fee paid 
09.01.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2009Examination requested  [2009/15]
25.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2014Observations by third parties
26.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.2015Fee for grant paid
20.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.11.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.01.2016  02.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA FRANCE
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Leca, François Michel
ARKEMA France
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
 02  29.12.2015  04.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Mexichem Fluor S.A. de C.V.
Eje 106 (sin número)
Zona Industrial
C.P. 78395
San Luis Potosi, S.L.P. / MX
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  29.01.2016   
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Bldg. 2-4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi Kita-ku
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/10]
Opponent(s)01  27.01.2016  02.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA FRANCE
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Leca, François Michel
Arkema France
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
 02  29.12.2015  04.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Mexichem Fluor S.A. de C.V.
Eje 106 (sin número)
Zona Industrial
C.P. 78395
San Luis Potosi, S.L.P.
San Luis Potosi / MX
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  29.01.2016   
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Bldg. 2-4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi Kita-ku
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2016/09]
Opponent(s)01  27.01.2016   
ARKEMA FRANCE
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Leca, François Michel
Arkema France
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
08.03.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.09.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
08.11.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.11.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition08.01.2018Appeal received No.  T0024/18
19.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
22.12.2017Appeal received No.  T0024/18
08.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
10.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
12.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.06.2007
AT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
BG29.04.2015
CY29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
MT29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
SE29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
TR29.04.2015
IE22.06.2015
LU22.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2017/03]AT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
MT29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
IE22.06.2015
LU22.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/37]AT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
IE22.06.2015
LU22.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/24]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
IE22.06.2015
LU22.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/22]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
IE22.06.2015
LU22.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/20]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
IE22.06.2015
LU22.06.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/10]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
LU22.06.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/09]AT29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/08]AT29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/07]AT29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2015/50]FI29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2015/49]FI29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2015/42]NL29.04.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2005108334  (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * examples 1-3; claims 1-24 *;
 [A]EP0974571  (ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA ELF [US]) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-6 *;
 [PX]WO2007019355  (DU PONT [US], et al) [PX] 1 * claim 1, steps c)-d); *;
 [PA]WO2007053689  (DU PONT [US], et al) [PA] 14 * claims 1-8 *
by applicantUS2006106263
 WO2005108334
 EP0974571
 US2009264690
 US5396000
 US4902838
 US6369284
 US5268122
 US5136113
 US4978649
 US2007100173
 US2007100175
otherEP1067106
OppositionWO2005108334
 EP0974571
 WO2007019355
 WO2007053689
 US6369284
 EP1067106
 US2006106263
 US2007112230
 US706107
 WO2007117391
 WO2007056194
 WO2008057794
 WO2007053736
 WO9427940
 US6294055
 US2003060671
 US3432562
    - sianesi et al, Ann. Chim (Rome, (19650000), vol. 55, no. 8-9, pages 850 - 61, XP055255434
    - sianesi, "fluororoolefins-cis and trans 1,2,3,3,3-pentafluoropropylene", Ann. Chim (Rome, (19650000), pages 850 - 861, XP055255437
    - Translation of D8
    - KNUNYANTS et al., "communication 13 catalytic hydrogenation of perfluoro olefins", Russian chemical bulletin, (19600800), pages 1412 - 1418, XP008133500
    - M. HUDLICKÝ, Chemistry of Organic Fluorine Compounds, (19920000), pages 491 - 494, XP055255591
    - Experimental Report on the reproduction of Example 4 of Dai-3