Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021052

EP2021052 - IMPLANTABLE THERAPEUTIC SUBSTANCE DELIVERY SYSTEM WITH CATHETER ACCESS PORT CONTROL AND METHOD OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.10.2012
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medtronic, Inc.
710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
MEDTRONIC, INC.
710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis MN 55432-5604 / US
Former [2008/41]For all designated states
MEDTRONIC, INC.
710 Medtronic Parkway Northeast
Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HAASE, James M.
3016 Frank Street
Maplewood, MN 55109 / US
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Hughes, Andrea Michelle
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Hughes, Andrea Michelle
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date07797283.426.04.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007US67518
Priority number, dateUS2006041331128.04.2006         Original published format: US 413311
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007127853
Date:08.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2021052
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/142, A61M5/168, A61M39/22
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:IMPLANTIERBARES THERAPEUTISCHES SUBSTANZZUFUHRSYSTEM MIT KATHETERZUGANGSSTEUERUNG UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN[2009/07]
English:IMPLANTABLE THERAPEUTIC SUBSTANCE DELIVERY SYSTEM WITH CATHETER ACCESS PORT CONTROL AND METHOD OF USE[2009/07]
French:SYSTEME IMPLANTABLE D'ADMINISTRATION DE SUBSTANCE THERAPEUTIQUE AVEC COMMANDE D'ORIFICE D'ACCES DE CATHETER ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase24.11.2008National basic fee paid 
24.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
18.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.05.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/47]
04.07.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/47]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.11.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
06.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO0217989  (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [Y] 1-17 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 5, paragraph 5 *;
 [Y]US4482346  (REINICKE ROBERT H [US]) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO0122185  (MASCO CORP [US], et al) [Y] 6-10,14 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * page 8, line 18 - page 9, line 25 *;
 [A]WO9956803  (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0951916  (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1,14 * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0027] *;
 [A]US5169393  (MOOREHEAD ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 6-10 * abstract * * figures 3,4 *