Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021053

EP2021053 - IMPLANTABLE THERAPEUTIC SUBSTANCE DELIVERY DEVICE WITH SEPTUM GUIDE AND METHOD OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.03.2011
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.04.2011  [2011/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medtronic, Inc.
710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
MEDTRONIC, INC.
710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis MN 55432-5604 / US
Former [2008/41]For all designated states
MEDTRONIC, INC.
710 Medtronic Parkway Northeast
Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HAASE, James M.
3016 Frank Street
Maplewood, MN 55109 / US
02 / DEWING, Wende
5637 Beard Avenue South
Edina, MN 55410 / US
03 / WENGER, William K.
500 Robert Street North, 619
St. Paul, MN 55101 / US
04 / BULLEMER, Beth
3375 Lake Haughey Road
Maple Plain, MN 55359 / US
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Hughes, Andrea Michelle
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Hughes, Andrea Michelle
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date07797285.926.04.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007US67524
Priority number, dateUS2006041331328.04.2006         Original published format: US 413313
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007127855
Date:08.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2021053
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/142
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:IMPLANTIERBARE THERAPEUTISCHE SUBSTANZZUFUHRVORRICHTUNG MIT SEPTUM-FÜHRUNG UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN[2009/07]
English:IMPLANTABLE THERAPEUTIC SUBSTANCE DELIVERY DEVICE WITH SEPTUM GUIDE AND METHOD OF USE[2009/07]
French:APPAREIL D'ADMINISTRATION DE SUBSTANCE THÉRAPEUTIQUE IMPLANTABLE AVEC SEPTUM GUIDE ET MÉTHODE D'UTILISATION[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase24.11.2008National basic fee paid 
24.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
01.11.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/17]
07.12.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201004   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US6592571  (VERBEEK MAURICE THEODORE YVONN [NL], et al) [X] 1,6-9,12,13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4286584  (SAMPSON EDWARD J, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US6293922  (HAASE JAMES MARTIN [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5741228  (LAMBRECHT GREGORY H [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,11 * * column 6, line 36 - line 49 *