Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020917

EP2020917 - ISOLATION SYSTEM FOR MRI-COMPATIBLE WIRELESS PATIENT MONITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  09.01.2009
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.06.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INVIVO CORPORATION
12601 Research Parkway
Orlando, FL 32826 / US
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / FISHER, Stephen, Douglas
629 Dolphin Road
Winter Springs, Florida 32708 / US
02 / RIKENBERGER, Jon
41 Pine Valley Circle
Ormond Beach, Florida 32174 / US
03 / VAN ARSDEL, Kenneth
3016 White Ash Trail
Orlando, Florida 32826 / US
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)de Haan, Poul Erik , et al
Philips International B.V.
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2012/34]Verweij, Petronella Danielle , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2009/07]Schouten, Marcus Maria
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date07797407.910.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007US68630
Priority number, dateUS20060799884P12.05.2006         Original published format: US 799884 P
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007134146
Date:22.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2020917
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/05, A61B5/0428, A61B5/055
[2010/23]
Former International [2009/07]A61B5/05
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ISOLIERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR MRI-KOMPATIBLE DRAHTLOSE PATIENTENMONITORE[2009/07]
English:ISOLATION SYSTEM FOR MRI-COMPATIBLE WIRELESS PATIENT MONITORS[2009/07]
French:SYSTÈME D'ISOLATION POUR DISPOSITIFS SANS FIL DE SURVEILLANCE DE PATIENTS COMPATIBLE AVEC L'IRM[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2008National basic fee paid 
12.12.2008Search fee paid 
Examination procedure30.01.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
01.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
31.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
31.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
01.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2002077560  (KRAMER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE69121063T  (ODAM SA [FR]) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5627902  (ZIARATI MOKHTAR [US]) [Y] 6 * column 6, line 28 - column 7, line 25 *
International search[Y]US5432544  (ZIARATI MOKHTAR [US]);
 [Y]US5277184  (MESSANA RUSSELL C [US]);
 [Y]US5627902  (ZIARATI MOKHTAR [US]);
 [Y]US5878746  (LEMELSON JEROME H [US], et al);
 [Y]US2005107681  (GRIFFITHS DAVID M [US]);
 [Y]US5160943  (PETTIGREW ROBERT M [GB], et al);
 [Y]US6878112  (LINBERG KURT R [US], et al);
 [Y]US6215454  (TRAN ALLEN [US])
by applicantUS20050080958
 US20050080743