Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022005

EP2022005 - PRODUCTS AND PROCESSES FOR UTILIZING ORDER DATA AND RELATED DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.01.2012
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.01.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.02.2012  [2012/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CFPH, LLC
110 E. 59th Street
New York, NY 10022 / US
[2009/14]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Foley, Kevin
55 East 86th Street Apartment 15C
New York, NY 10028 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FOLEY, Kevin
55 east 86th Street, Apt. 15c
New York, NY 10028 / US
02 / SILVESTRI, John
11 Gifford Street
Tuckahoe, NY 10707 / US
03 / DALEY, Thomas
3011, Chukar Drive
McKinney, TX 75070 / US
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/33]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford & Co. 16 High Holborn London
WC1V 6BX / GB
Former [2009/07]Hill, Justin John , et al
McDermott Will & Emery UK LLP 7 Bishopsgate
London EC2N 3AR / GB
Application number, filing date07797456.614.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007US68900
Priority number, dateUS20060799897P13.05.2006         Original published format: US 799897 P
US20060820053P21.07.2006         Original published format: US 820053 P
US20060825504P13.09.2006         Original published format: US 825504 P
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007134299
Date:22.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2022005
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.04.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06Q40/00, G06Q30/00
[2011/12]
Former International [2009/07]G06Q40/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PRODUKTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANWENDUNG VON AUFTRAGSDATEN UND ÄHNLICHEN DATEN[2009/07]
English:PRODUCTS AND PROCESSES FOR UTILIZING ORDER DATA AND RELATED DATA[2009/07]
French:PRODUITS ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION DE DONNÉES DE COMMANDE ET DE DONNÉES APPARENTÉES[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase28.11.2008National basic fee paid 
28.11.2008Search fee paid 
28.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
28.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
20.09.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/08]
25.10.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]US2006031156  (NOVIELLO JOSEPH C [US], et al);
 [Y]US2005166046  (BELLOVIN STEVEN M [US], et al)