Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023917

EP2023917 - SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND APPARATUSES FOR ADVERTISEMENT GENERATION, SELECTION AND DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM REGISTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.04.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
05.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Monster Worldwide, Inc.
622 Third Avenue, 39th Floor
New York, NY 10017 / US
[2012/27]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Monster (California), Inc.
C/o Monster Worldwide, Inc. 622 Third Ave. 39Fl.
New York NY 10017 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DELLOVO, Danielle
5 Village Way
North Andover, Massachusetts 01845 / US
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Anderson, Oliver Ben , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[2013/01]
Former [2012/27]Turnbull, Alexander James , et al
avidity IP
Merlin House
Falconry Court
Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Former [2009/08]Fennell, Gareth Charles , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date07797464.014.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007US68916
Priority number, dateUS20060747176P12.05.2006         Original published format: US 747176 P
US20060747405P16.05.2006         Original published format: US 747405 P
US20060824888P07.09.2006         Original published format: US 824888 P
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007134309
Date:22.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2023917
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.03.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06Q30/00
[2009/23]
Former International [2009/08]A61K31/381
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesAL12.12.2008
BA12.12.2008
HR12.12.2008
MK12.12.2008
RS12.12.2008
TitleGerman:SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE REGISTRIERUNG EINES SYSTEMS ZUR ERSTELLUNG, AUSWAHL UND VERTEILUNG VON WERBUNG[2009/08]
English:SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND APPARATUSES FOR ADVERTISEMENT GENERATION, SELECTION AND DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM REGISTRATION[2009/08]
French:SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS DE GÉNÉRATION, DE SÉLECTION ET DE DISTRIBUTION D'ANNONCES ET ENREGISTREMENT DANS LE SYSTÈME[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2008National basic fee paid 
12.12.2008Search fee paid 
12.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
16.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.12.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2015Date of oral proceedings
19.02.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
19.02.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination01.05.2015Appeal received No.  T1442/15
01.07.2015Statement of grounds filed
30.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.12.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
21.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US2006069614  (AGARWAL ET AL.);
 [A]US2005222901  (AGARWAL ET AL.);
 [A]US2005097204  (HOROWITZ ET AL.);
 [A]US2004186776  (LLACH);
 [A]US2003046139  (BEMAN ET AL.)