Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027723

EP2027723 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS TO SUPPORT MULTIPLE PROGRAM GUIDES IN A HOME NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Change - applicantpublished on 20.03.2019 [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Synamedia Limited
One London Road
Staines Upon Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EX / GB
[2019/12]
Former [2018/08]For all designated states
Cisco Technology, Inc.
170 West Tasman Drive
San Jose, CA 95134 / US
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
SCIENTIFIC-ATLANTA, INC.
5030 Sugarloaf Parkway
Lawrenceville, GA 30044 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHAN, Peter
924 Spring Glen Place
Suwanee, GA 30024 / US
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Mathys & Squire LLP
The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/33]Mathys & Squire LLP
120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
Former [2009/09]Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique , et al
Novagraaf International SA 25, avenue du Pailly
1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH
Application number, filing date07797466.515.05.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007US68918
Priority number, dateUS2006042325309.06.2006         Original published format: US 423253
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007146529
Date:21.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2027723
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/173, H04N5/00, H04N7/16, H04N5/445
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2009/51]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG MEHRERER PROGRAMMFÜHRER IN EINEM HEIMNETZWERK[2009/09]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS TO SUPPORT MULTIPLE PROGRAM GUIDES IN A HOME NETWORK[2009/09]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR SUPPORTER DE MULTIPLES GUIDES DE PROGRAMME DANS UN RÉSEAU DOMESTIQUE[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase12.11.2008National basic fee paid 
12.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
12.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
19.06.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
29.07.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
25.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.06.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO0052930  (STARSIGHT TELECAST INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,9,10,13 * the whole document * [Y] 2,5,6,8,11,12,14,15;
 [YA]US2002194586  (GUTTA SRINIVAS [US], et al) [Y] 2,5,8,11,12,14 * the whole document * [A] 1,9;
 [YA]EP1530115  (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [Y] 6,15 * the whole document * [A] 1,9;
 [A]WO0232136  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6530083  (LIEBENOW FRANK [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - GUTTA S ET AL, "Face and hand gesture recognition using hybrid classifiers", AUTOMATIC FACE AND GESTURE RECOGNITION, 1996., PROCEEDINGS OF THE SECO ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON KILLINGTON, VT, USA 14-16 OCT. 1996, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19961014), ISBN 978-0-8186-7713-7, pages 164 - 169, XP010200415 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AFGR.1996.557259
by applicantWO0052930
 US2002194596
 EP1530115