Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022034

EP2022034 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ASSESSING, SCORING, GROUPING AND PRESENTING NUTRITIONAL VALUE INFORMATION OF FOOD PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.07.2015
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hannaford Licensing Corp.
145 Pleasant Hill Road
Scarborough, ME 04074 / US
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / CULVER, Stephen, F.
12 Arbor Lane
Cape Elizabeth, ME 04107 / US
02 / FISCHER, Leslie, M.
64 Beverly Drive
Durham, NC 27707 / US
03 / MCBRIDE, James, L.
41 Many Oaks Lane
Windham, ME 04062 / US
04 / SUTHERLAND, Lisa, A.
6 Mink Drive
Hanover, NH 03755-3108 / US
05 / VITAGLIANO, John, A.
2615 Hamilton Crossing Drive
Charlotte, NC 28214 / US
 [2009/19]
Former [2009/07]01 / CULVER, Stephen, F.
12 Arbor Lane
Cape Elizabeth, ME 04107 / US
02 / FISCHER, Leslie, M.
64 Beverly Drive
Durham, NC 27707 / US
03 / MCBRIDE, James, L.
41 Many Oaks Lane
Windham, ME 04062 / US
04 / SUTHERLAND, Lisa, A.
55 Lyme Road
Hanover, NH 03755 / US
05 / VITAGLIANO, John, A.
2615 Hamilton Crossing Drive
Charlotte, NC 28214 / US
Representative(s)Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4
76135 Karlsruhe / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Lemcke, Brommer & Partner
Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16
76133 Karlsruhe / DE
Application number, filing date07797543.117.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007US69130
Priority number, dateUS2006043731519.05.2006         Original published format: US 437315
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007137110
Date:29.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2022034
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.01.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:G09B19/00, G09F23/00, G06Q10/08, G06F19/00, // G06Q50/10
[2014/20]
Former International [2009/07]G09F23/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR HILFE, PUNKTUNG, GRUPPIERUNG UND VORSTELLUNG VON NÄHRWERTINFORMATIONEN FÜR LEBENSMITTELPRODUKTE[2009/07]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ASSESSING, SCORING, GROUPING AND PRESENTING NUTRITIONAL VALUE INFORMATION OF FOOD PRODUCTS[2009/07]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'ÉVALUATION, DE NOTATION, DE GROUPAGE ET DE PRÉSENTATION D'INFORMATION DE VALEUR NUTRITIONNELLE DE PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase22.11.2008National basic fee paid 
22.11.2008Search fee paid 
22.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
22.01.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.11.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/34]
23.12.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201509   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]US6375077  (HANKINS TIMOTHY GLYN [GB]) [I] 1-18 * columns 1-3; figures 2-7 *;
 [I]US5412560  (DENNISON DARWIN [US]) [I] 1-18 * columns 1-2; figures 1-19 *
International search[X]US6663564  (MILLER-KOVACH KAREN [US], et al);
 [A]US2006018998  (GREEN NANCY R [US], et al)
 [Y]  - SCOTT J., "Nutrition Profiling-Guiding Consumer Choice", BEUC/TACD CONFERENCE, (20051201), URL: http://www.tacd.org/events/ge2/j_scott.ppt, XP008101021
 [Y]  - SEDDON, "Soy and Soy-based Foods?", NATIONAL HEART FOUNDATION OF NEW ZEALAND'S NUTRITION ADVISORY COMMITTEE, (199903), URL: http://www.nhf.org.nz/files/National%20Dietitian/Soy%20and%20Soy-based%20Foods_March1999.pdf, XP008101030