Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024832

EP2024832 - PROCESSOR CORE STACK EXTENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.04.2016
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.06.2016  [2016/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QUALCOMM Incorporated
Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
QUALCOMM Incorporated
Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JIAO, Guofang
10680 Hunters Glen Drive
San Diego, California 92130 / US
02 / YU, Chun
11496 Cypress Woods Drive
San Diego, California 92131 / US
03 / DU, Yun
12341 Katydid Circle
San Diego, California 92129 / US
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Former [2009/08]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date07797563.917.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007US69191
Priority number, dateUS2006044827206.06.2006         Original published format: US 448272
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007146544
Date:21.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2024832
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/50
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:STAPELERWEITERUNG EINES PROZESSORKERNS[2009/08]
English:PROCESSOR CORE STACK EXTENSION[2009/08]
French:EXTENSION DE PILE DE COEUR DE PROCESSEUR[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2008National basic fee paid 
11.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
25.02.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/22]
25.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2016/22]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.05.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
10.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201509   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US5101486  (OKAMOTO TADASHI [JP]) [X] 1-45 * abstract * * column 2, lines 24-53; figures 1-12b * * column 3, line 20 - column 6, line 29; claims 1-9 *;
 [X]US4405983  (PEREZ-MENDEZ PEDRO I [US]) [X] 1-45 * abstract * * column 2, lines 10-24 * * column 2, line 33 - column 5, line 50; claims 1-7 *;
 [A]GB2343032  (SUN MICROSYTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-45 * abstract * * page 3, line 6 - page 5, line 7 * * page 8, line 3 - page 16, line 22; figures 12-7c *;
 [A]US5727178  (PLETCHER RICHARD ALLEN [US], et al) [A] 1-45 * abstract * * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 31 * * column 8, line 1 - column 12, line 21; figures 1-6b; claims 1-23 *