Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020118

EP2020118 - NETWORK LATENCY ANALYSIS PACKET AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.04.2010
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.05.2010  [2010/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT&T Corporation
32 Avenue of the Americas
New York NY 10013-2412 / US
[2009/06]
Inventor(s)01 / WERNER, Carl, E.
6 Kathy Court
Holmdel, New Jersey 07733 / US
02 / RAUSCHER, Frank
7955 Saw Mill Road
New Tripoli, Pennsylvania 18066 / US
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)Asquith, Julian Peter
Marks & Clerk LLP
Fletcher House
Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park
Oxford OX4 4GE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/06]Asquith, Julian Peter
Marks & Clerk 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford
Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB
Application number, filing date07797635.522.05.2007
[2009/06]
WO2007US69412
Priority number, dateUS2006043985124.05.2006         Original published format: US 439851
[2009/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007140172
Date:06.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2020118
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/26, H04L12/24
[2009/06]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/24]
Former [2009/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PAKET UND VERFAHREN ZUR NETZWERKLATENZANALYSE[2009/06]
English:NETWORK LATENCY ANALYSIS PACKET AND METHOD[2009/06]
French:PAQUET ET PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE DE LATENCE DE RÉSEAU[2009/06]
Entry into regional phase28.10.2008National basic fee paid 
28.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
28.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.03.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.10.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/06]
30.12.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
28.01.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
06.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.11.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/18]
21.12.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XAY]EP0993146  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,3-5,7-11,16,18 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 25 * * column 2, line 36 - line 43 * * column 3, line 11 - column 6, line 27; figures 1,2A,2B,4 * [A] 6,12,13,17,19 [Y] 2,14,15,20;
 [YA]US2003048754  (BRUCKMAN LEON [IL]) [Y] 2,14 * page 1, paragraph 6 * * page 2, paragraph 12 - paragraph 17 * [A] 7,8;
 [YA]US6545979  (POULIN ANDRE [CA]) [Y] 15,20 * column 1, line 57 - column 3, line 13 * * column 3, line 47 - column 5, line 54; figures 1,2 * [A] 11;
 [A]US6587438  (BRENDEL JUERGEN [US]) [A] 1,11,20 * column 4, line 36 - column 12, line 67; figure 10 *