Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023935

EP2023935 - DRUG ADMINISTRATION METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.06.2011
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.06.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.07.2011  [2011/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cylene Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
5820 Nancy Ridge Drive, Suite 200
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / LIM, John
3806 Quartermile Drive
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
02 / WHITTEN, Jeffrey P.
9957 Jill Street
Santee, CA 92071 / US
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Sexton, Jane Helen
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Sexton, Jane Helen
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date07798036.501.06.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007US70272
Priority number, dateUS20060803864P03.06.2006         Original published format: US 803864 P
US20060805975P27.06.2006         Original published format: US 805975 P
US20060821115P01.08.2006         Original published format: US 821115 P
US20060857988P08.11.2006         Original published format: US 857988 P
US20070939326P21.05.2007         Original published format: US 939326 P
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007143587
Date:13.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2023935
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/538, A61K31/485, A61K31/522
[2010/51]
Former International [2009/08]A61K31/535
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ARZNEIMITTELVERABREICHUNG[2009/08]
English:DRUG ADMINISTRATION METHODS[2009/08]
French:PROCÉDÉS D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2008National basic fee paid 
11.12.2008Search fee paid 
11.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
03.01.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/30]
10.02.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201004   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2006029950  (WHITTEN JEFFREY P [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8,11-13 * page 3, paragraph 26 * * page 4; figures 35,36 * * page 6, paragraph 76 * * pages 526,527; example 65 * * pages 528,529; example 66 * * pages 540,541; claims 13,14,23 * * page 482, paragraphs 87,89 * * page 526 - paragraph 423; table 17 * [Y] 4,5,7,10 [I] 3,9,14,15;
 [Y]  USMANI OMAR S ET AL, "Theobromine inhibits sensory nerve activation and cough.", THE FASEB JOURNAL : OFFICIAL PUBLICATION OF THE FEDERATION OF AMERICAN SOCIETIES FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY FEB 2005 LNKD- PUBMED:15548587, (200502), vol. 19, no. 2, ISSN 1530-6860, pages 231 - 233, XP002609390 [Y] 4,5,7,10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1096/FJ.04-1990FJE
 [Y]  "Persistent coughs melt away with chocolate", (20041122), Federation of American Societies for Experimental Biology Journal, URL: http://www.chocolate.org/health/theobromine.html, (20101112), XP002609391 [Y] 4,5,7,10 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US2006029950  (WHITTEN JEFFREY P [US], et al);
 [Y]US2006052596  (MULLER GEORGE W [US], et al);
 [A]  - RINI ET AL., "Phase II Trial of Weekly Intravenous Gemcitabine with Continuous Infusion Fluorouracil in Patients with Metastatic Renal Cell Cancer", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (2000), vol. 18, no. 12, pages 2419 - 2426, XP008092785
 [A]  - WOLFGANG ET AL., "Prediction of Response to Preoperative Chemotherapy in Adenocarcinomas of the Esophagogastric Junction by Metabolic Imaging", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (2001), vol. 19, no. 12, pages 3058 - 3065, XP008092786